Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3205376

EP3205376 - FIRE PROTECTION FLAP WITH INTUMESCENCE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.07.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.08.2018  [2018/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bartholomäus, Gert
Bussenblick 10
89607 Emerkingen / DE
[2017/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Bartholomäus, Gert
Bussenblick 10
89607 Emerkingen / DE
02 / Fiderer, Stefan
Abt-Eugen-Fiderer-Str. 21
89607 Emerkingen / DE
 [2017/33]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt Dr.-Ing. Peter Riebling Postfach 3160
88113 Lindau / DE
[2017/33]
Application number, filing date17000068.113.01.2017
[2017/33]
Priority number, dateDE2016100151210.02.2016         Original published format: DE102016001512
[2017/33]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3205376
Date:16.08.2017
Language:DE
[2017/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:A62C2/06, A62C2/14
[2017/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BRANDSCHUTZKLAPPE MIT INTUMESZENZ-MATERIAL[2017/33]
English:FIRE PROTECTION FLAP WITH INTUMESCENCE MATERIAL[2017/33]
French:CLAPET DE PROTECTION INCENDIE COMPRENANT UN MATÉRIAU INTUMESCENT[2017/33]
Examination procedure17.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/35]
29.03.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/35]
Documents cited:Search[X]DE19938498  (WILDEBOER WERNER [DE]) [X] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP0824940  (BARTHOLOMAEUS GERT [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2305202  (WACHE HUBERT [FR]) [A] 6,7 * figures 3-8; claim - *;
 [A]DE19627987  (BARTHOLOMAEUS GERT [DE]) [A] 7,8 * figure -; claim - *
by applicantDE10043774
 AT411965B