Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3351885

EP3351885 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRYING PLANT FOR MOIST WOOD DRYING PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2019
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaindl, Rupert
Alpenstrasse 24
8853 Lachen / CH
[2018/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2018/30]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2018/30]
Application number, filing date17000106.923.01.2017
[2018/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3351885
Date:25.07.2018
Language:DE
[2018/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:F26B17/00, F26B21/04, F26B23/02, F26B25/00
[2018/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/30]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER TROCKNUNGSANLAGE FÜR FEUCHTES HOLZ UND TROCKNUNGSANLAGE[2018/30]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING A DRYING PLANT FOR MOIST WOOD DRYING PLANT[2018/30]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SÉCHOIR POUR BOIS HUMIDE ET INSTALLATION DE SÉCHAGE[2018/30]
Examination procedure31.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/31]
08.03.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/31]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IY]DE102010023391  (PIECO GMBH [DE]) [I] 1,2,4-6,14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003]; figures 1, 2 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] * * claims 1, 7 * [Y] 3,13,15,16;
 [YA]US2011056090  (LARSSON OLA [SE], et al) [Y] 3,13,15,16 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0007] , [0008]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0046] * [A] 1,2,6;
 [I]WO2014071800  (SUNSHINE KAIDI NEW ENERGY GROUP CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1,2,5,6,17 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] - [0013]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] *;
 [YA]US2005229780  (SPINK EDWARD F [CA], et al) [Y] 3,13,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 1,5
by applicantEP2889537