Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3240099

EP3240099 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE IN THE FORM OF AN INJECTION MOLDED PART HAVING INSERTED PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Häusermann GmbH
Zitternberg 100
3571 Gars am Kamp / AT
[2017/44]
Inventor(s)01 / Hörth, Stefan
Oberer Markt 3
3631 Ottenschlag / AT
02 / Jarisch, Christoph
Im Grübl 37
3561 Zöbing / AT
03 / Janesch, Rudolf
Wassergasse 679
3571 Gars am Kamp / AT
 [2017/44]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2017/44]
Application number, filing date17000570.605.04.2017
[2017/44]
Priority number, dateDE2016100529129.04.2016         Original published format: DE102016005291
[2017/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3240099
Date:01.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01M10/48, H01M10/42, H05K5/06, B29C45/14
[2017/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/44]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRONISCHEN GERÄTES IN DER FORM EINES SPRITZGUSSTEILS MIT EINGELEGTER LEITERPLATTE[2017/44]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ELECTRONIC DEVICE IN THE FORM OF AN INJECTION MOLDED PART HAVING INSERTED PRINTED CIRCUIT BOARD[2017/44]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN APPAREIL ÉLECTRONIQUE SOUS LA FORME D'UNE PIÈCE MOULÉE PAR INJECTION COMPRENANT UNE CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ INSÉRÉE[2017/44]
Examination procedure03.05.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/44]
12.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/44]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2014094754  (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,10,11,16 * page 7, line 15 - page 15, line 2; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,3,8,9,12-15;
 [XY]EP2887778  (ZUMTOBEL LIGHTING GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,7,16 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 4;
 [Y]US2008298063  (HAYASHI MASAKI [JP]) [Y] 2,8 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0161]; figures 1-33 *;
 [Y]DE112014001422T  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,13,14 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0093]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]DE102014013375  (HÄUSERMANN GMBH [AT]) [Y] 4,9,12,13,15 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] *
by applicantWO2012164506
 EP0939066
 WO0042098
 WO03013845