Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3252261

EP3252261 - FOLDABLE CROSS BRACE FOR PITCHING LADDERS AND MULTI-PIECE LADDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.03.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SE
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hymer-Leichtmetallbau GmbH & Co. KG
Käferhofen 10
88239 Wangen / DE
[2019/08]
Former [2017/49]For all designated states
Hymer-Leichtmetallbau GmbH & Co. KG
Käferhofen 10
88239 Wangen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Büchele, Volker
Oflingser Weg 6
88239 Wangen / DE
02 / Dentler, Reinhard
Enkenhofen 13
88260 Argenbühl / DE
03 / Hartmann, Günther
Vorderschweinhöf 10
88179 Oberreute / DE
 [2017/49]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2017/49]
Application number, filing date17000657.119.04.2017
[2017/49]
Priority number, dateDE2016100663403.06.2016         Original published format: DE102016006634
[2017/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3252261
Date:06.12.2017
Language:DE
[2017/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3252261
Date:20.02.2019
Language:DE
[2019/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:E06C7/42, E06C7/48
[2017/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/15]
Former [2017/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KLAPPBARE TRAVERSE FÜR ANLEGELEITERN UND MEHRTEILIGE LEITERN[2017/49]
English:FOLDABLE CROSS BRACE FOR PITCHING LADDERS AND MULTI-PIECE LADDERS[2017/49]
French:BARRE TRANSVERSALE POUR ÉCHELLE SIMPLE ET ÉCHELLES EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES[2017/49]
Examination procedure19.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/15]
17.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.11.2018Fee for grant paid
29.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
[2019/34]
Former [2019/33]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
NO20.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013292525  (WORTHINGTON GARY LANDON [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * figures 1-10 *;
 [XI]US3086612  (MCKINLEY DONALD E) [X] 1-4,9 * figures 1, 2, 6 * [I] 5,6;
 [X]US2004154867  (ZHENG EDWARD [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * figures 1-6 *;
 [XI]US625066  (F.S. SEAGRAVE [US]) [X] 1,4,5,9 * figures 1, 2 * [I] 8
by applicantDE102014117975
 GB190909014
 DE102007061357