Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3239650

EP3239650 - MEASURING INSTRUMENT FOR DETERMINING CABLE LENGTHS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.08.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.01.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
30.09.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jehle, Paul
Raiffeisenstrasse 18
88214 Ravensburg / DE
[2017/44]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/44]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2017/44]
Application number, filing date17000709.026.04.2017
[2017/44]
Priority number, dateDE201620102194U26.04.2016         Original published format: DE 202016102194 U
[2017/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3239650
Date:01.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01B7/02, B65H49/20, B65H61/00
[2017/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/08]
Former [2017/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MESSGERÄT ZUM BESTIMMEN VON KABELLÄNGEN[2017/44]
English:MEASURING INSTRUMENT FOR DETERMINING CABLE LENGTHS[2017/44]
French:APPAREIL DE MESURE DESTINÉ À LA DÉTERMINATION DE LONGUEURS DE CÂBLE[2017/44]
Examination procedure26.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/08]
11.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2019Fee for grant paid
26.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]DE9208515U  (ROBOTERTECHNIK-TRANSFER GMBH ZITTAU) [X] 1,2,6-8 * the whole document * [A] 4,9-15 [I] 3,5;
 [XAI]DE2023123  (VER DRAHT & KABELWERKE AG) [X] 1,2,7,8 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 8; figure 1 * [A] 4,6,9-15 [I] 3,5;
 [XAI]US5339022  (FLEMING DAVID F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7 * column 2, line 6 - column 5, line 66; figures 1,2 * [A] 6,8-15 [I] 3,5;
 [XAI]US2003128039  (WATKINS LEE A [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0047]; figure 1 * [A] 4,6,8-15 [I] 3,5