Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3260168

EP3260168 - LIGHT THERAPY PLATFORM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.12.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.01.2020 [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
199 Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
[2017/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Tapper, Jay
208 Upland Way
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
02 / Blaustein, Lawrence, A.
603 Main Street
Chagrin Falls, OH 44022 / US
03 / Shuter, David
106 Playa Rienta Way
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US
04 / Freitag, Eric
156 Hicks Street
Brooklyn, NY 11201 / US
05 / Althoff, Charles, Peter
501 W 47th Street, 3W
New York, NY 10036 / US
06 / Bramley, Alistair
100 Maspeth Avenue, Apt. 3D
Brooklyn, NY 11211 / US
07 / Zadeh, Allen
324 22nd street apt: 4
Brooklyn, NY 11215 / US
08 / Shuter, Daniel, Joseph
106 Playa Rienta Way
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US
09 / Lorenc, Zbigniew, Paul
983 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10028 / US
 [2019/05]
Former [2017/52]01 / Tapper, Jay
208 Upland Way
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
02 / Blaustein, Lawrence, A.
603 Main Street
Chagrin Falls, OH 44022 / US
03 / Shuter, David
106 Playa Rienta Way
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US
04 / Freitag, Eric
156 Hicks Street
Brooklyn, NY 11201 / US
05 / Althoff, Charles, Peter
501 W 47th Street, 3W
New York, NY 10036 / US
06 / Bramley, Alistair
100 Maspeth Avenue, Apt. 3D
Brooklyn, NY 11211 / US
07 / Zadeh, Allen
324 22nd street apt:4
Brooklyn, NY 11215 / US
08 / Shuter, Daniel, Joseph
106 Playa Rienta Way
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US
09 / Lorenc, Zbigniew, Paul
983 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10028 / US
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2017/52]
Application number, filing date17000791.806.09.2012
[2017/52]
Priority number, dateUS201161532140P08.09.2011         Original published format: US 201161532140 P
US20121360401205.09.2012         Original published format: US201213604012
[2017/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3260168
Date:27.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3260168
Date:30.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61N5/06, // A61B18/00
[2017/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/31]
Former [2017/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:LICHTTHERAPIE-PLATTFORMSYSTEM[2017/52]
English:LIGHT THERAPY PLATFORM SYSTEM[2017/52]
French:SYSTÈME DE PLATE-FORME DE THÉRAPIE LUMINEUSE[2017/52]
Examination procedure08.05.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.06.2018Examination requested  [2018/31]
25.06.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.12.2018Fee for grant paid
13.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12830671.9  / EP2753400
Divisional application(s)EP19154182.0
Opposition(s)31.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
18.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL30.01.2019
CZ30.01.2019
DK30.01.2019
EE30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RO30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
SK30.01.2019
SM30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AL30.01.2019
CZ30.01.2019
DK30.01.2019
EE30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RO30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
SK30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/48]DK30.01.2019
FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/39]FI30.01.2019
HR30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
LV30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
RS30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
IS30.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/38]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
BG30.04.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/37]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
GR01.05.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/35]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
PL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NL30.01.2019
SE30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI30.01.2019
LT30.01.2019
NO30.04.2019
PT30.05.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004162549  (ALTSHULER GREGORY B [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 51] - [0057] * * figures 7, 8 * * table 1 *;
 [A]DE202009000891U  (FRANK RITA [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0014] * * figure 4 *;
 [A]GB2380134  (PHOTO THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 11 - page 10, line 22 * * figure 1 * * claims 12, 13 *;
 [A]US2005070977  (MOLINA SHERRY L [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0047] , [0 56] - [0059] * * figures 2, 3 * * table 2 *;
 [A]US2011160814  (TUCKER GAVIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-8 *