Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3276102

EP3276102 - ASSEMBLY FOR VENTILATING A LABORATORY ROOM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.05.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wobatech AG
Sihleggstrasse 23
8832 Wollerau / CH
[2018/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Gallmann, Martin
Näfenhäuser 20
8926 Kappel am Albis / CH
02 / Alpiger, Thomas
Bachtelstraße 16
8808 Pfäffikon / CH
 [2018/05]
Representative(s)Kesselhut, Wolf
Reble & Klose Rechts- und Patentanwälte Konrad-Zuse-Ring 32
68163 Mannheim / DE
[2018/05]
Application number, filing date17000945.002.06.2017
[2018/05]
Priority number, dateDE2016100914827.07.2016         Original published format: DE102016009148
EP2016000253930.11.2016         Original published format: EP 16002539
[2018/05]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3276102
Date:31.01.2018
Language:DE
[2018/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3276102
Date:19.09.2018
Language:DE
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:E04B9/02
[2018/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/36]
Former [2018/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUR BELÜFTUNG EINES LABORRAUMS[2018/05]
English:ASSEMBLY FOR VENTILATING A LABORATORY ROOM[2018/05]
French:SYSTÈME D'AÉRATION D'UN LABORATOIRE[2018/05]
Examination procedure02.06.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/12]
30.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2018Fee for grant paid
24.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
[2019/26]
Former [2019/24]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[XD]WO2007033821  (LUEDI & CO AG GAS UND ENERGIES [CH]; LUEDI HANSJUERG [CH]) [XD] 1-14 * page 5, line 14 - page 9, line 16; figures 1-2 *;
 [A]EP0834706  (MEISSNER & WURST [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2009153674  (GEMINO S R L [IT]; GRANDI RUGGERO [IT]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2007033821