Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3305434

EP3305434 - CASSETTE ADAPTED TO RECEIVE A PROFILE ROLE SET OR PRESSURE FORMING SET TO ADJUST THE SHAPE OF A LAMELLAE CARRIER OR THE LIKE AND CORRESPONDING DEFORMATION TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 10.04.2019  [2019/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
WEBO Werkzeugbau Oberschwaben GmbH
Hummelau 3
88279 Amtzell / DE
For all designated states
Transform Automotive LLC, Inc.
7026 Sterling Ponds Court
Sterling Heights MI 488312 / US
[2018/15]
Inventor(s)01 / ZIESEL, Norbert
Singenberg 29
88279 Amtzell / DE
02 / MEIER, Thomas
657 Lochmoore Court
Rochester Hills, Michigan 48307 / US
 [2018/15]
Representative(s)Riebling, Holger
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dr. Peter Riebling
Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2018/15]
Application number, filing date17001736.221.01.2016
[2018/15]
Priority number, dateDE2015100973331.07.2015         Original published format: DE102015009733
[2018/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3305434
Date:11.04.2018
Language:DE
[2018/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3305434
Date:10.04.2019
Language:DE
[2019/15]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:B21H1/20, B21D15/02, B21D53/28, B21H5/02, B21H7/18
[2018/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/15]
TitleGerman:KASSETTE GEEIGNET ZUR AUFNAHME EINES PROFILROLLENSATZES ODER DRÜCKUMFORMSATZES ZUM UMFORMEN VON LAMELLENTRÄGERN ODER DERGLEICHEN UND ENTSPRECHENDES UMFORMWERKZEUG[2018/15]
English:CASSETTE ADAPTED TO RECEIVE A PROFILE ROLE SET OR PRESSURE FORMING SET TO ADJUST THE SHAPE OF A LAMELLAE CARRIER OR THE LIKE AND CORRESPONDING DEFORMATION TOOL[2018/15]
French:CASSETTE CONÇUE POUR RECEVOIR UN ENSEMBLE DE ROULEAUX PROFILÉS OU UN ENSEMBLE DE PIÈCES FORMÉES PAR COMPRESSION DESTINÉS À LA FORMATION DE SUPPORTS DE LAMELLES OU ANALOGUES ET OUTIL DE FORMATION CORRESPONDANT[2018/15]
Examination procedure23.10.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/15]
22.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.01.2019Fee for grant paid
22.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.02.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16000140.0  / EP3124132
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE102008017608  (AWEBA WERKZEUGBAU GMBH AUE [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051]; figures 3-8 *;
 [A]DE102013221391  (ALLGAIER WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 *;
 [AD]DE102013006216  (WEBO WERKZEUGBAU OBERSCHWABEN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0073]; figure 5 *;
 [A]DE19531907  (SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 3 - line 10 * * column 2, line 18 - line 37 * * column 3, line 11 - line 15 * * column 4, line 8 - line 15 * * column 5, line 41 - column 7, line 67; figures 1-6 *;
 [AD]DE102006025034  (MUELLER WEINGARTEN MASCHF [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-4 *