Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3332630

EP3332630 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INJECTING A SUBSTANCE UNDER THE BARK OF A PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.12.2018
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2019Change - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
10.04.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 23.01.2019  [2019/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lauragri Services
La Pousaraque
31460 Le Faget / FR
For all designated states
Précision Mécanique Technique (PREMETEC)
3 Route de Toulouse
09700 Saverdun / FR
[2018/24]
Inventor(s)01 / Beuste, Philippe
Les Regourdes Hautes
31460 Le Faget / FR
 [2018/24]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2018/24]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date17001982.206.12.2017
[2018/24]
Priority number, dateFR2016000173706.12.2016         Original published format: FR 1601737
[2018/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3332630
Date:13.06.2018
Language:FR
[2018/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:A01G7/06
[2018/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/04]
Former [2018/24]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR INJEKTION EINER SUBSTANZ UNTER DIE RINDE EINER PFLANZE[2018/24]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR INJECTING A SUBSTANCE UNDER THE BARK OF A PLANT[2018/24]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR INJECTION D'UNE SUBSTANCE SOUS L'ÉCORCE D'UNE PLANTE[2018/24]
Examination procedure13.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/04]
13.12.2018Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2013010909  (UNIV PADOVA [IT], et al) [I] 1-7,9 * pages 7,8; figures 1a-8 *;
 [I]US3461588  (JOHNSON NELS J) [I] 1-7,9 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5239773  (DOOLITTLE JR GLAYNE D [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [A]US2004025420  (WILD PETER M [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0027]; figure 4 *;
 [A]US5797215  (DOOLITTLE GLAYNE D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 3, lines 38-49; figure 2 *;
 [A]GB345694  (RUDOLF PFISTER) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-5,7 *