Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231846

EP3231846 - CONCENTRATED AQUEOUS SILK FIBROIN SOLUTION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.05.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TUFTS UNIVERSITY
4th floor, Ballou Hall Medford
MA 02155 / US
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / KAPLAN, David L
46 Pond Street
Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US
02 / PARK, Jeahyung
1121 Highland Lake Circle
Decatur, Georgia 30033 / US
03 / JIN, Hyoung-Joon
Singeong-Dong 1305-206
Yangcheon-gu
Seoul 158-773 / KR
04 / KIM, Ung-Jin
513-1401 Cheongsol
Songgang-dong, Youseong-gi
Daejeon 305-503 / KR
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/42]Brown, David Leslie
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date17151081.112.04.2004
[2017/42]
Priority number, dateUS20030461716P10.04.2003         Original published format: US 461716 P
US20040551186P08.03.2004         Original published format: US 551186 P
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3231846
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:C08L89/00
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/22]
Former [2017/42]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:KONZENTRIERTE WÄSSRIGE SEIDENFIBROINLÖSUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON[2017/42]
English:CONCENTRATED AQUEOUS SILK FIBROIN SOLUTION AND USE THEREOF[2017/42]
French:SOLUTION AQUEUSE CONCENTRÉE DE FIBROÏNE DE SOIE ET SON UTILISATION[2017/42]
Examination procedure11.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
18.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/22]
29.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2019Observations by third parties
03.09.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04785887.3  / EP1613796
Request for further processing for:The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor
31.08.2017Request for further processing filed
31.08.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.09.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 13
29.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 14
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 15
29.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 16
Documents cited:Search[XI]US4820418  (HIROTSU TOSHIHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1,12 * examples 1-6 * [I] 2-11,13,14;
 [XI]  - HIRAI Y ET AL, "Some comments on the penetration of water vapor into regenerated silk fibroin", POLYMER, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, GB, (20010601), vol. 42, no. 12, doi:10.1016/S0032-3861(00)00857-0, ISSN 0032-3861, pages 5495 - 5499, XP004231017 [X] 1 * the whole document * [I] 2-14

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0032-3861(00)00857-0
by applicantWO9708315
 US5245012
 US6302848
 US6395734
 US6127143
 US5263992
 US6379690
 US5015476
 US4806355
 US6372244
 US6310188
 US5093489
 US387413
 US6325810
 US6337198
 US6267776
 US5576881
 US6245537
 US5902800
 US5270419
 US6423252
 US6110590
    - ASAKURA ET AL., Encylopedia of Agricultural Science, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1994), vol. 4, pages 1 - 11
    - ALTMAN, G. H. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2003), vol. 24, pages 401 - 416
    - CAPPELLO ET AL., J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (1998), vol. 53, pages 105 - 117
    - FOO, C. W. P. ET AL., ADV. DRUG DELIVER. REV., (2002), vol. 54, pages 1131 - 1143
    - DINERMAN, A. A. ET AL., J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (2002), vol. 82, pages 277 - 287
    - MEGEED, Z. ET AL., ADV. DRUG DELIVER. REV., (2002), vol. 54, pages 1075 - 1091
    - PETRINI, P. ET AL., J. MATER. SCI-MATER. M., (2001), vol. 12, pages 849 - 853
    - ALTMAN, G. H. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2002), vol. 23, pages 4131 - 4141
    - PANILAITIS, B. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2003), vol. 24, pages 3079 - 3085
    - MEINEL ET AL., ANN BIOMED ENG., (200401), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 112 - 22
    - NAZAROV, R. ET AL., BIOMACROMOLECULES IN PRESS
    - MINOURA, N. ET AL., POLYMER, (1990), vol. 31, pages 265 - 269
    - CHEN, J.; TANIOKA, A. ET AL., MINOURA, N., (1994), vol. 35, pages 2853 - 2856
    - TSUKADA, M. ET AL., POLYM. SCI. PART B POLYRN. PHYSICS, (1994), vol. 32, pages 961 - 968
    - MEGEED ET AL., PHARM RES., (200207), vol. 19, no. 7, pages 954 - 9
    - DINERMAN ET AL., J CONTROL RELEASE., (20020821), vol. 82, no. 2-3, pages 277 - 87
    - LI, M. ET AL., J. APPL. POLY. SCI., (2001), vol. 79, pages 2192 - 2199
    - MIN, S. ET AL., SEN'I GAKKAISHI, (1997), vol. 54, pages 85 - 92
    - LUCAS ET AL., ADV. PROTEIN CHEM, (1958), vol. 13, pages 107 - 242
    - ALTMAN ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2003), vol. 24, page 401
    - SCHAFFNER P; DARD, CELL MOL LIFE SCI., (200301), vol. 60, no. L, pages L 19 - 32
    - HERSEL U. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, vol. 24, no. 24, pages 4385 - 415
    - FRIEDENSTEIN, A.J., INT REV CYTOL, (1976), vol. 47, pages 327 - 359
    - FRIEDENSTEIN ET AL., CELL TISSUE KINET, (1987), vol. 20, pages 263 - 272
    - CAPLAN, A.I., CLIN PLAST SURG, (1994), vol. 21, pages 429 - 435
    - MACKAY ET AL., TISSUE ENG, (1998), vol. 4, pages 415 - 428
    - HERZOG ET AL., BLOOD, (20030731), vol. 102, no. 10, pages 3483 - 93
    - HOLY ET AL., J. BIOMED. MATER. RES, (2003), vol. 65A, pages 447 - 453
    - SOFIA ET AL., JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 54, pages 139 - 148
    - ZHANG, R.Y. ET AL., BIOMED. MATER. RES., (1999), vol. 44, pages 446 - 455
    - THOMSON RC ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (1998), vol. 19, pages 1935 - 1943
    - CURTIS RA ET AL., BIOPHYS CHEM, (2002), vol. 98, pages 249 - 265
    - GRIGSBY JJ ET AL., BIOPHYS CHEM, (2001), vol. 91, pages 231 - 243
    - ZHOU, C. Z. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2000), vol. 28, pages 2413 - 2419
    - BRAUN, F. N. ET AL., INT. J. BIOL. MACROMOL., (2003), vol. 32, pages 59 - 65
    - MITA, K. ET AL., J. MOL. EVOL., (1994), vol. 38, pages 583 - 592
    - CURTIS, R.A. ET AL., BIOPHYS. CHEM, ., (2002), vol. 98, pages 249 - 265
    - ROBINSON, D.R. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1965), vol. 87, pages 2470 - 2479
    - LI, G.Y. ET AL., BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 268, pages 6600 - 6606
    - KIM UJ ET AL., BIOMACROMOLECULES, IN PRESS
    - ASAKURA, T. ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (1985), vol. 18, pages 1841 - 1845
    - NAZAROV R ET AL., BIOMACROMOLECULES, IN PRESS
    - MA L. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2003), vol. 24, pages 4833 - 4841
    - MAQUET V. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2004), vol. 25, pages 4185 - 4194
    - HARRIS LD. ET AL., JBIOMED MATER RES, (1998), vol. 42, pages 396 - 402
    - NAZAROV R. ET AL., BIOMACROMOLECULES, IN PRESS
    - PARSEGIAN, V. A. ET AL., Methods in Enzymology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), vol. 127, page 400
    - VOLLRATH, F. ET AL., PROC. R. SOC. LONDON B, (1998), vol. 265, pages 817 - 820
    - LI, M. ET AL., J APPL. POLYM. SCI., (2001), vol. 79, pages 2185 - 2191
    - MAGOSHI, J. ET AL., Polymeric Materials Encyclopedia, CRC PRESS: NEWYORK, (1996), vol. 1, page 667
    - MAGOSHI, J. ET AL., Polymeric Materials Encyclopedia, CRC PRESS, (1996), vol. 1, page 667
    - AYUB, Z. H. ET AL., BIOSCI. BIOTECH. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 57, pages 1910 - 1912
    - HANAWA, T. ET AL., CHEM. PHARM. BULL., (1995), vol. 43, pages 284 - 288
    - KANG, G. D. ET AL., MARCROMOL. RAPID COMMUN., (2000), vol. 21, pages 788 - 791
    - KANG,. G. D. ET AL., MARCROMOL. RAPID COMMUN., (2000), vol. 21, pages 788 - 791
    - AJISAWA, A. J., SERIC. SCI. JPN., (1998), vol. 67, pages 91 - 94
    - HA, S.W. ET AL., BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2003), vol. 4, pages 488 - 496
    - OCHI, A. ET AL., BIOMACROMOLECULES, (2002), vol. 3, pages 1187 - 1196
    - BINI, E. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (2004), vol. 335, pages 27 - 40
    - JIN, H. J. ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 424, pages 1057 - 1061
    - JIN, H. ET AL., NATURE, (2003), vol. 424, pages 1057 - 1061
    - VALLUZZI, R. ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (1999), vol. 103, pages 11382 - 11392
    - LEE, K. Y. ET AL., CHEM. REV., (2001), vol. 101, pages 1869 - 1879
    - CAPPELLO, J. ET AL., J. CONTROL. RELEASE, (1998), vol. 53, pages 105 - 117
    - PETRINI, P. ET AL., J. MATER. SCI-MATER. M, (2001), vol. 12, pages 849 - 853
    - SINGH ET AL., JBIOL CHEM, (1990), vol. 65, pages 18696 - 18701
    - KATOH K. ET AL., BIOMATERIALS, (2004), vol. 25, pages 4255 - 4262
    - THOMSON R ET AL., In Principles of Tissue Engineering, ACADEMIC PRESS, (2000), pages 251 - 262
    - SIKAVITSAS VI. ET, JBIOMED MATER RES, vol. 62, pages 136 - 148
    - FERGUSON C. ET AL., MECH. DEV., (1999), vol. 87, pages 57 - 66
    - GERBER H. ET AL., NAT. MED., (1999), vol. 5, pages 623 - 628
    - NAKAGAWA T. ET AL., ORAL DISEASES, (2003), vol. 9, pages 255 - 263
    - YAE, KL. ET AL., J. BONE MINER. RES., (1994), vol. 9, pages 231 - 240
    - FISHER LW. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1982), vol. 258, pages 6588 - 6594
    - FEDARKO NS. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1990), vol. 265, pages 12200 - 12209
otherUS4820418
 WO2004000915
 WO03060099
 EP1613796
 WO2005012606
    - HYOUNG-JOON JIN et al., "Biomaterial films of Bombyx mori silk fibroin with poly(ethylene oxide)", Biomacromolecules, (20040123), pages 711 - 717, XP002978212

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bm0343287
    - JEFF HABY, "ATMOSPHERIC WATER VAPOR", theweatherprediction.com, (20140214), URL: http://www.theweatherprediction.com/habyhints/40/, XP055598543
    - Hans-Jörg Köhler, "Sommerliche Umkehrdiffusion", Köhler Bedachungen, pages 1 - 5, URL: http://www.bedachungen-koehler.de/sommerliche-umkehrdiffusion/, XP055598536