Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3205412

EP3205412 - METHOD FOR SORTING PRE-SORTED MAIL ITEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.08.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solystic
152-160 avenue Aristide Briand
92220 Bagneux / FR
[2017/33]
Inventor(s)01 / BENYOUB, Belkacem
500 résidence les Eaux vives
91120 Palaiseau / FR
02 / VOLTA, Bruno
38 allée de la Clairière
91190 Gif sur Yvette / FR
03 / ARCAS-LUQUE, Gilles
6 rue Victor Schoelcher
94230 Cachan / FR
 [2018/12]
Former [2017/33]01 / BENYOUB, Belkacem
500 résidence les Eaux vives
91120 Palaiseau / FR
02 / VOLTA, Bruno
38 allée de la Clairière
91190 GIF SUR YVETTE / FR
03 / ARCAS-LUQUE, Gilles
6 rue Victor Schoelcher
94230 CACHAN / FR
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2017/33]
Application number, filing date17151476.313.01.2017
[2017/33]
Priority number, dateFR2016005104110.02.2016         Original published format: FR 1651041
[2017/33]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3205412
Date:16.08.2017
Language:FR
[2017/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3205412
Date:21.03.2018
Language:FR
[2018/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:B07C3/14
[2017/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/36]
Former [2017/33]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM SORTIEREN VON VORSORTIERTEN POSTARTIKELN[2017/33]
English:METHOD FOR SORTING PRE-SORTED MAIL ITEMS[2017/33]
French:METHODE POUR TRIER DES ARTICLES DE COURRIER PRE-TRIES[2017/33]
Examination procedure13.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.08.2017Examination requested  [2017/36]
19.12.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.02.2018Fee for grant paid
09.02.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.02.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MC21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/12]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
IT21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2019/08]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
DK21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/52]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
SM21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/50]AL21.03.2018
AT21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
CZ21.03.2018
EE21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
PL21.03.2018
RO21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
SK21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/46]AL21.03.2018
CY21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/43]CY21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
MT21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
LV21.03.2018
RS21.03.2018
BG21.06.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
GR22.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY21.03.2018
HR21.03.2018
LT21.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0000300  (CRISPLANT AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 30, line 17 - line 22 *;
 [A]DE102007038186  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] *;
 [A]EP1920852  (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0058] *