Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3196399

EP3196399 - CONTROL DEVICE OF WINDOW COVERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.11.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip04.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nien Made Enterprise Co., Ltd.
19F-1, No. 236, Sec.2
Wuquan W. Road
Nantun District
Taichung City 408 / TW
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Lin
19F-1, NO.236, Sec.2, Wuchiuan West Road
Taichung, Taiwan 408 / CN
02 / NIEN, Keng-Hao
19F-1, NO.236, Sec.2, Wuchiuan West Road
Taichung, Taiwan 408 / CN
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Brauhaus 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/30]Cordina, Kevin John
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Application number, filing date17151829.317.01.2017
[2017/30]
Priority number, dateCN20162065142U22.01.2016         Original published format: CN 201620065142 U
CN20162094802U29.01.2016         Original published format: CN 201620094802 U
US201662318771P06.04.2016         Original published format: US 201662318771 P
US201662326020P22.04.2016         Original published format: US 201662326020 P
[2017/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3196399
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/322, E06B9/388, E06B9/80, E06B9/262
[2019/03]
Former International [2017/30]E06B9/322, E06B9/388, E06B9/80
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/10]
Former [2017/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES FENSTERABDECKSYSTEMS[2017/30]
English:CONTROL DEVICE OF WINDOW COVERING SYSTEM[2017/30]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE SYSTÈME DE RECOUVREMENT DE FENÊTRE[2017/30]
Examination procedure17.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/10]
19.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2015136336  (HUANG SZU-CHANG [TW]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1, 3-6, 8, 9 * [A] 13,20 [I] 2-12,14-19;
 [A]US2014083631  (HUANG SZU-CHANG [TW]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2009078380  (CHENG LI-MING [TW]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023]; figures 2-8 *;
 [A]CN204552565U  (SHANTOU RONGDA NEW MATERIAL CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * english machine translation of description; page 3, lines 4-34 essentially corresponding to paragraphs [0028]-[0036]; paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1-3 *