Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3196886 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3196886



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 205
30.10.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
30.10.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.05.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
15.05.2019 Claims Search / examination 1
15.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.05.2019 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.02.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
05.02.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
21.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
21.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
21.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
21.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.09.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
24.05.2018 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
24.05.2018 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
17.05.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
06.02.2018 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
31.01.2018 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
30.01.2018 Deficiencies in application documents Search / examination 5
18.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.01.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.01.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
18.01.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
18.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
31.07.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.06.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.06.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 2
16.06.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
16.06.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
26.05.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
27.03.2017 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 101
19.01.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.01.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.01.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
19.01.2017 Description Search / examination 16
19.01.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.01.2017 Drawings Search / examination 10
19.01.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5