blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3246468

EP3246468 - TRAFFIC BARRIER STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ETI Ltd.
77, Bongseo-ro
Yongjin-eup
Wanju-Gun
Jeollabuk-do / KR
[2017/47]
Inventor(s)01 / An, Eun Hee
6-2, Sangsam 1-gil, Yongjin-eup, Wanju-Gun
Jeollabuk-do / KR
 [2017/47]
Representative(s)Spengler, Robert
Potthast & Spengler
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Magirus-Deutz-Straße 12
89077 Ulm / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/47]Spengler, Robert
Küfergasse 11
89073 Ulm / DE
Application number, filing date17154285.501.02.2017
[2017/47]
Priority number, dateKR2016006126819.05.2016         Original published format: KR 20160061268
[2017/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3246468
Date:22.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3246468
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2017
ClassificationIPC:E01F15/04
[2017/47]
CPC:
E01F15/025 (EP,US); E01F15/04 (CN,KR,US); E01F15/0423 (CN,KR);
E01F15/043 (EP,KR,US); E01F15/0438 (EP,CN,KR,US); E01F15/0461 (CN,US);
E01F15/0492 (EP,US); E01F15/146 (US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/47]
TitleGerman:VERKEHRSSPERRSTRUKTUR[2017/47]
English:TRAFFIC BARRIER STRUCTURE[2017/47]
French:STRUCTURE DE BARRIÈRE DE TRAFIC[2017/47]
Examination procedure01.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/47]
16.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.11.2018Fee for grant paid
30.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.02.2017
AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CY09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
MK09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
IE01.02.2019
LU01.02.2019
MT01.02.2019
BE28.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2022/32]
Former [2021/33]HU01.02.2017
AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CY09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
IE01.02.2019
LU01.02.2019
MT01.02.2019
BE28.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2021/31]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CY09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
SM09.01.2019
IE01.02.2019
LU01.02.2019
MT01.02.2019
BE28.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2021/26]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CY09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
IE01.02.2019
LU01.02.2019
MT01.02.2019
BE28.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2020/29]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
IE01.02.2019
LU01.02.2019
MT01.02.2019
BE28.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2020/12]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
IE01.02.2019
LU01.02.2019
BE28.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2020/09]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
IE01.02.2019
LU01.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/49]AL09.01.2019
AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
LU01.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
LU01.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/47]AT09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
LU01.02.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/39]FI09.01.2019
HR09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RS09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/38]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/37]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
NL09.01.2019
NO09.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL09.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]AT361966B  (UT VASUTTERVEZOE VALLALAT [HU]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 6; figures 1,2,3,6,7,8 *;
 [A]DE202012102548U  (WANG CHIH CHEN [TW]) [A] 1 * figure - *;
 [A]KR101209897B  (SIN JEONG HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1* figure - *;
 [A]KR101611345B  (DONG SHIN CONSTRUCTION CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * figure - *
by applicantKR101507481B
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.