Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3228308

EP3228308 - ALCOHOL RESISTANT DOSAGE FORMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.04.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Euro-Celtique S.A.
1, rue Jean Piret
2350 Luxembourg / LU
[2017/41]
Inventor(s)01 / MANNION, Richard Owen
3860 Green Ridge Road
Furlong, PA Pennsylvania 18925 / US
02 / MCKENNA, William, H.
10 Long Meadow Road
Yonkers, NY New York 10704 / US
03 / O'DONNELL, Edward, P.
38 Chestnut Court
Basking Ridge, NJ New Jersey 07920 / US
04 / DANAGHER, Helen, Kathleen
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road
Cambridge, CB4 0GW / GB
05 / HAYES, Geoffrey, Gerard
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
06 / MOHAMMAD, Hassan
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, CB4 0GW / GB
07 / PRATER, Derek Allan
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
08 / TAMBER, Harjit
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road
Cambridge, CB4 0GW / GB
09 / WALDEN, Malcolm
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road
Cambridge, CB4 0GW / GB
10 / WHITELOCK, Steve
c/o Mundipharma Res
Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge, CB4 0GW / GB
11 / FLEISCHER, Wolfgang
-
deceased / DE
12 / HAHN, Udo
Nordstrasse 1
56412 Nentershausen / DE
13 / SPITZLEY, Christof
Am Linsengraben 2
65627 Elbtal / DE
14 / LEUNER, Christian
Blauwiesenweg 65
60439 Frankfurt / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2017/45]01 / MANNION, Richard Owen
3860 Green Ridge Road
Furlong, PA Pennsylvania 18925 / US
02 / MCKENNA, William, H.
10 Long Meadow Road
Yonkers, NY New York 10704 / US
03 / O'DONNELL, Edward, P.
38 Chestnut Court
Basking Ridge, NJ New Jersey 07920 / US
04 / DANAGHER, Helen, Kathleen
P.O. Box Mundipharma Research Limited
191 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
05 / HAYES, Geoffrey, Gerard
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
06 / MOHAMMAD, Hassan
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, CB4 0GW / GB
07 / PRATER, Derek Allan
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
08 / TAMBER, Harjit
P.O. Box Mundipharma Res
191 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
09 / WALDEN, Malcolm
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park, Milton Road
Cambridge, CB4 0GW / GB
10 / WHITELOCK, Steve
c/o Mundipharma Res
Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge, CB4 0GW / GB
11 / FLEISCHER, Wolfgang
-
deceased / DE
12 / HAHN, Udo
Nordstrasse 1
56412 Nentershausen / DE
13 / SPITZLEY, Christof
Am Linsengraben 2
65627 Elbtal / DE
14 / LEUNER, Christian
Blauwiesenweg 65
60439 Frankfurt / DE
Former [2017/41]01 / MANNION, Richard Owen
3860 Green Ridge Road
Furlong, PA Pennsylvania 18925 / US
02 / MCKENNA, William, H.
10 Long Meadow Road
Yonkers, NY New York 10704 / US
03 / O'DONNELL, Edward, P.
38 Chestnut Court
Basking Ridge, NJ New Jersey 07920 / US
04 / DANAGHER, Helen, Kathleen
P.O. Box Mundipharma Research Limited
191 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
05 / HAYES, Geoffrey, Gerard
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
06 / MOHAMMAD, Hassan
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
191 Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
07 / PRATER, Derek Allan
c/o Mundipharma Research Limited
Cambridge Science Park
Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
08 / TAMBER, Harjit
P.O. Box Mundipharma Res
191 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
09 / WALDEN, Malcolm
P.O. Box Mundipharma Research Limited
191 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
10 / WHITELOCK, Steve
P.O. Box Mundipharma Res
191 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road
Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 0GW / GB
11 / FLEISCHER, Wolfgang
-
deceased / DE
12 / HAHN, Udo
Nordstrasse 1
56412 Nentershausen / DE
13 / SPITZLEY, Christof
Am Linsengraben 2
65627 Elbtal / DE
14 / LEUNER, Christian
Blauwiesenweg 65
60439 Frankfurt / DE
Representative(s)Ledl, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/41]Ledl, Andreas
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date17154428.127.01.2006
[2017/41]
Priority number, dateGB2005000163828.01.2005         Original published format: GB 0501638
WO2005GB5001411.02.2005         Original published format: PCT/GB2005/050014
US20050670506P12.04.2005         Original published format: US 670506 P
US20050730339P26.10.2005         Original published format: US 730339 P
[2017/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3228308
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K31/00
[2017/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/41]
Extension statesAL02.02.2017
BA02.02.2017
HR02.02.2017
MK02.02.2017
YU02.02.2017
TitleGerman:ALKOHOLRESISTENTE DARREICHUNGSFORMEN[2017/41]
English:ALCOHOL RESISTANT DOSAGE FORMS[2017/41]
French:FORMES POSOLOGIQUES RÉSISTANTES À L'ALCOOL[2017/41]
Examination procedure02.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/41]
02.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06703915.6  / EP1771160
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
02.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
24.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
24.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
02.02.201711   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2017
02.02.201712   M06   Fee paid on   12.07.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2004054542  (DURECT CORP [US]; YUM SU IL [US]; SCHOENHARD GRANT [US]; TIPTON ARTHUR) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * figures 1-4,7,11; claims 1-79 *;
 [XD]US2003118641  (MALONEY ANN [US] ET AL) [XD] 1-15 * the whole document * * examples 1-3; claims 1-6 *;
 [I]GB2196848  (EURO CELTIQUE SA) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * * claims 1-30 *
 [T]  - AMABILE CELENE M ET AL, "Overview of oral modified-release opioid products for the management of chronic pain", ANNALS OF PHARMACOTHE, HARVEY WHITNEY BOOKS COMPANY, US, (20060701), vol. 40, no. 7-8, ISSN 1060-0280, pages 1327 - 1335, XP009125854 [T] * the whole document *
 [T]  - WALDEN MALCOLM ET AL, "The effect of ethanol on the release of opioids from oral prolonged-release preparations", DRUG DEVELOPMENT AND INDUSTRIAL PHAR, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 33, no. 10, doi:10.1080/03639040701377292, ISSN 0363-9045, (20071001), pages 1101 - 1111, (20070921), XP008105537 [T] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/03639040701377292
by applicantUS5266331
 US5508042
 US5549912
 US5656295
 US5958452
 US5965161
 US5968551
 US6294195
 US6335033
 US6706281
 US6743442
 US2003118641
 US2005163856
 US2004052731