Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3357880

EP3357880 - PROTECTIVE COATING COMPOSITION FOR SILICEOUS SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.02.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 20.11.2019  [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
3M Innovative Properties Company
3M Center
Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
[2018/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Schuell, Christoph
3M Deutschland GmbH
Carl-Schurz-Str. 1
41453 Neuss / DE
02 / Jing, Naiyong
3M Company
P.O. Box 33427 3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
 [2019/47]
Former [2018/32]01 / Schuell, Mr. Christoph
3M Deutschland GmbH
Carl-Schurz-Str. 1
41453 Neuss / DE
02 / Jing, Mr. Naiyong
3M Company
P.O. Box 33427 3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US
Representative(s)Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne
3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L.
Hermeslaan 7
1831 Diegem / BE
[2018/32]
Application number, filing date17154603.903.02.2017
[2018/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3357880
Date:08.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3357880
Date:20.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:C03C17/00, C03C17/22, C03C17/30, C03C17/32, C09D133/08, C09D183/02, C08L83/02
[2018/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/12]
Former [2018/32]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SCHUTZBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR SILIKATISCHEN SUBSTRATEN[2018/32]
English:PROTECTIVE COATING COMPOSITION FOR SILICEOUS SUBSTRATES[2018/32]
French:COMPOSITION DE REVÊTEMENT DE PROTECTION POUR SUBSTRATS SILICEUX[2018/32]
Examination procedure06.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/12]
06.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.06.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.2019Fee for grant paid
08.10.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.10.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAY]KR20130082300  (NANO SOLUTION CO LTD [KR]) [X] 14 * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0049] * [A] 13,15 [Y] 1-12;
 [A]JP2002302637  (SUMITOMO OSAKA CEMENT CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [YA]WO2010062893  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 2, lines 1-7 * * page 8, lines 4-12,23-27 * * page 8 * * page 9, lines 12-15 * * claims 1-2,8-9,15-17 * [A] 13-15
by applicantUS5976680
 WO2010062893
 WO2005100521
 WO2005100520