Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3229073

EP3229073 - THREE-DIMENSIONAL, 360-DEGREE VIRTUAL REALITY CAMERA SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  05.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.04.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FI, IS
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2017/41]
Inventor(s)01 / CABRAL, Brian Keith
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
02 / BRIGGS, Forrest Samuel
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
03 / HSU, Joyce
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
04 / POZO, Albert Parra
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
05 / COWARD, Andrew
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
 [2017/41]
Representative(s)Schröer, Gernot H.
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
[2017/41]
Application number, filing date17154618.703.02.2017
[2017/41]
Priority number, dateUS201662318822P06.04.2016         Original published format: US 201662318822 P
US20161509614011.04.2016         Original published format: US201615096140
WO2017US1583431.01.2017         Original published format: PCT/US2017/015834
[2017/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3229073
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3229073
Date:31.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2017
ClassificationInternational:G03B35/08, G03B37/04, G06T19/00
[2017/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/19]
Former [2017/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:DREI-DIMENSIONAL, 360-GRAD VIRTUELLES WIRKLICHKEIT KAMERASYSTEM[2017/41]
English:THREE-DIMENSIONAL, 360-DEGREE VIRTUAL REALITY CAMERA SYSTEM[2017/41]
French:SYSTÈME DE CAMERAS POUR 360 DEGRÉS DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE EN TROIS DIMENSIONS[2017/41]
Examination procedure03.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/19]
11.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.2018Fee for grant paid
10.09.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.09.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI31.10.2018
LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
IS28.02.2019
[2019/21]
Former [2019/20]LT31.10.2018
NO31.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO0244808  (RVC LLC [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 2, line 14 - page 10, line 26; figures 1-3 * [I] 2-9;
 [XI]US2016088280  (SADI SAJID [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-9;
 [A]US2004246333  (STEUART LEONARD P SKIP [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2015373269  (OSBORNE THOMAS WESLEY [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0147]; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US2015254871  (MACMILLAN TIMOTHY [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0048]; figures 1-4 *