EP3159127 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PLASTIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING THERMOPLASTIC AND THERMOSET MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conenor Oy Poukamankatu 12 15240 Lahti / FI | For all designated states Vilkki, Markku Poukamankatu 12 15240 Lahti / FI | [2020/29] |
Former [2017/17] | For all designated states Conenor Oy Teollisuustie 13 33330 Tampere / FI | ||
For all designated states Vilkki, Markku Poukamankatu 12 15240 Lahti / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vilkki, Markku Poukamankatu 12 15240 Lahti / FI | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab (Salmisaarenaukio 1) P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2020/29] |
Former [2017/17] | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 17155520.4 | 10.02.2017 | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3159127 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3159127 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3159127 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/00, B29B7/10, B29B7/90, B29B9/08, // B29K105/24, B29K101/12, B29K105/06, B29B9/16 | [2019/10] | CPC: |
B29B7/005 (EP,US);
B29B17/0026 (CN);
B29B13/022 (US);
B29B13/045 (US);
B29B7/10 (EP,US);
B29B7/90 (EP,US);
B29B9/08 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (US);
C08K3/26 (US);
C08K3/346 (US);
C08K3/36 (US);
C08K3/38 (US);
C08K3/40 (US);
C08K5/09 (US);
C08K5/14 (US);
C08L23/06 (US);
C08L23/12 (US);
C08L23/20 (US);
C08L25/06 (US);
C08L27/06 (US);
C08L55/02 (US);
C08L63/00 (US);
C08L67/00 (US);
C08L75/04 (US);
B29B9/16 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2105/06 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2105/065 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2105/106 (US);
B29K2105/24 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/18] | B29B17/00, // B29K105/06, B29K105/24, B29K101/12 | ||
Former IPC [2017/17] | B29B17/00, // B29K105/06, B29K105/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2017/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KUNSTSTOFFMISCHUNG ENTHALTEND THERMOPLASTISCHES UND DUROPLASTISCHES MATERIAL | [2017/17] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PLASTIC COMPOSITION COMPRISING THERMOPLASTIC AND THERMOSET MATERIAL | [2017/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MÉLANGE PLASTIQUE COMPORTANT UN MATÉRIAU THERMOPLASTIQUE ET UN MATÉRIAU THERMODURCISSABLE | [2019/10] |
Former [2017/17] | PROCÉDÉ DER FABRICATION D'UN MELANGE PLASTIQUE COMPORTANT UN MATERIAU THERMOPLASTIQUE ET UN MATERIAU THERMODURCISSABLE | Examination procedure | 10.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 13.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.05.2020 | 12.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.02.2017 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | LU | 10.02.2021 | CH | 28.02.2021 | LI | 28.02.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 10.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MK | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 10.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 10.02.2017 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
LU | 10.02.2021 | ||
CH | 28.02.2021 | ||
LI | 28.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 15.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0401885 (MASTER SRL [IT]) [X] 1-3,11-13 * column 1, line 38 - line 53; claims 1-3 * [A] 4-8,15 [I] 9,10,14; | [XA]US5861117 (ROSENBAUM JAMES E [US]) [X] 1-14 * column 4, line 49 - line 59 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 60 * * column 8, line 15 - line 23 * [A] 15; | [XI]US2003125399 (ZHANG CHENGJIE [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0025] , [0033] , [0046]; claims 1,6-8,16,17 * [I] 3,7,10; | [XA]US6497956 (PHILLIPS THOMAS E [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * column 2, line 10 - line 53 * * column 3, line 3 - line 32 * * column 4, line 6 - line 16 * [A] 15 | Examination | WO0108862 |