Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231330

EP3231330 - BACK SUPPORT FOR A CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.04.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.04.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Haworth, Inc.
One Haworth Center
Holland, MI 49423 / US
[2017/42]
Inventor(s)01 / BEYER, Peter J.
3210 48th Street
Hamilton, MI 49419 / US
02 / FLEET, Kyle R.
925 92nd Street SW
Byron Center, MI 49315 / US
03 / SCHASEL, Michael E.
2629 Fairfield Drive
Zeeland, MI 49464 / US
04 / KERCHER, Todd A.
476 Island View Drive
Holland, MI 49424 / US
05 / GESSLER, Brian S.
4860 Eisenhower Drive
Hudsonville, MI 49426 / US
06 / BELLINGAR, Teresa A.
12972 Thistlewood Lane
Holland, MI 49424 / US
 [2019/20]
Former [2017/42]01 / BEYER, Peter J.
3210 48th Street
Hamilton, MI 49419 / US
02 / FLEET, Kyle R.
925 92nd Street SW
Byron Center, MI 49315 / US
03 / SCHASEL, Michael E.
2629 Fairfield Drive
Zeeland, MI 49464 / US
04 / KERCHER, Todd A.
476 Island View Drive
Holland, MI 49424 / US
05 / GESSLER, Brian S.
4860 Eisenhowever Drive
Hudsonville, MI 49426 / US
06 / BELLINGAR, Teresa A.
12972 Thistlewood Lane
Holland, MI 49424 / US
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/19]Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Former [2017/42]Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date17155690.510.02.2017
[2017/42]
Priority number, dateUS20161504272312.02.2016         Original published format: US201615042723
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3231330
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3231330
Date:08.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47C7/46
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/22]
Former [2017/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:RÜCKENLEHNE FÜR EINEN STUHL[2017/42]
English:BACK SUPPORT FOR A CHAIR[2017/42]
French:SUPPORT DORSAL D'UNE CHAISE[2017/42]
Examination procedure10.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/22]
01.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
02.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2019Fee for grant paid
28.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19170342.0  / EP3533360
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
02.08.2018Request for further processing filed
02.08.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.08.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL08.05.2019
ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
BG08.08.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/50]AL08.05.2019
ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
LV08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
RS08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
GR09.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL08.05.2019
ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
HR08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NL08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
SE08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
PT08.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES08.05.2019
FI08.05.2019
LT08.05.2019
NO08.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2011037431  (DUOBACK KOREA CO LTD [KR]; JUNG KWAN-YOUNG [KR]) [X] 1-4,6-10 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059]; figures 1-4,7,8,16 * [I] 5;
 [X]US2014265493  (MACHAEL JAY R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0089]; figures 1,4,9,11,12 *;
 [XA]US2014110983  (SANDER ARMIN [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,6-10 * paragraph [0062]; figures 2,6,7,8,9,10 * [A] 2,5;
 [XA]US2016029801  (POTRYKUS MARTIN W [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10 * paragraph [0077]; figures 2,3,4 * [A] 5,8