Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3187336

EP3187336 - INK SUPPLY DEVICE FOR PRINTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): EE, RO, SM
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
I. Mer Co., Ltd.
112 Joshungamae-cho
Shimotoba
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 612-8384 / JP
[2018/33]
Former [2017/27]For all designated states
I. Mer Co., Ltd.
108 Yamashiroyashiki-cho Misu Yokooji Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi
Kyoto 612-8207 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / YAMASAKI, Kenjiro
c/o I. MER CO. LTD.
112 Joshungamae-cho
Shimotoba
Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8384 / JP
 [2018/46]
Former [2017/27]01 / YAMASAKI, Kenjiro
c/o I. MER CO. LTD.
108 Yamashiroyashiki-cho
Misu
Yokooji, Fushimi-ku
Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 612-8207 / JP
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[2018/46]
Former [2017/27]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date17156027.916.09.2014
[2017/27]
Priority number, dateJP2013019822225.09.2013         Original published format: JP 2013198222
JP2013019822525.09.2013         Original published format: JP 2013198225
JP2013019823725.09.2013         Original published format: JP 2013198237
[2017/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3187336
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
[2017/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3187336
Date:14.11.2018
Language:EN
[2018/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:B41F31/14, B41F33/00, B41F31/30, B41F31/36
[2017/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/12]
Former [2017/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TINTENZUFÜHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR DRUCKMASCHINE[2017/27]
English:INK SUPPLY DEVICE FOR PRINTING MACHINE[2017/27]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN ENCRE POUR IMPRIMANTE[2017/27]
Examination procedure14.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/12]
29.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.2018Fee for grant paid
02.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14825081.4  / EP2896503
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
EE14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RO14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
SM14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
[2019/37]
Former [2019/35]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
CZ14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
PL14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/34]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
DK14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL14.11.2018
AT14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
PT14.03.2019
Former [2019/25]AT14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
RS14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/24]AT14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
SE14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
GR15.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/23]AT14.11.2018
FI14.11.2018
HR14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
LV14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
BG14.02.2019
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI14.11.2018
LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
IS14.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT14.11.2018
NO14.02.2019
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP2011073415  (AIMAA PLANNING KK) [AD] 1,2 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0012] - [0014]; figures 1-8 * * abstract *;
 [AD]EP1566270  (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [AD] 1,2 * paragraphs [0060] - [0078] - [0090] - [0093]; figures 2,3,12-14 *;
 [A]EP0131110  (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 23; figures 1-6; claims 1-3 *
by applicantJP2011073415
 JP2000141610
 EP1566270