Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3223149

EP3223149 - OBJECT STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino CA 95014 / US
[2018/31]
Former [2017/39]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014-2094 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHAUDHRI, Imran A.
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
02 / LOUCH, John O.
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
03 / HYNES, Christopher
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
04 / BUMGARNER, Timothy Wayne
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
05 / PEYTON, Eric Steven
c/o Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US
 [2017/39]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2017/39]
Application number, filing date17156261.430.05.2008
[2017/39]
Priority number, dateUS2007076069508.06.2007         Original published format: US 760695
[2017/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3223149
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/44, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0482
[2017/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/39]
TitleGerman:OBJEKTSTAPEL[2017/39]
English:OBJECT STACK[2017/39]
French:PILE D'OBJETS[2017/39]
Examination procedure15.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/39]
15.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08756522.2  / EP2156285
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
15.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
01.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
15.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[I]US2002080180  (MANDER RICHARD [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * figure 1 *