EP3223149 - OBJECT STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2020 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 11.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino CA 95014 / US | [2018/31] |
Former [2017/39] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014-2094 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAUDHRI, Imran A. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 02 /
LOUCH, John O. c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 03 /
HYNES, Christopher c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 04 /
BUMGARNER, Timothy Wayne c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | 05 /
PEYTON, Eric Steven c/o Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA, 95014 / US | [2017/39] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/39] | Application number, filing date | 17156261.4 | 30.05.2008 | [2017/39] | Priority number, date | US20070760695 | 08.06.2007 Original published format: US 760695 | [2017/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3223149 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44, G06F3/0481, G06F3/0482 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/39] | Title | German: | OBJEKTSTAPEL | [2017/39] | English: | OBJECT STACK | [2017/39] | French: | PILE D'OBJETS | [2017/39] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 15.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/42] | 10.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.09.2020 | 18.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08756522.2 / EP2156285 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002080180 (MANDER RICHARD [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] * * figure 1 * |