EP3242194 - DISPLAYING METHOD OF TOUCH INPUT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HiDeep Inc. 3F Dasan Tower 49 Daewangpangyo-ro 644 beon-gil, (676 Sampyeong-dong) Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-400 / KR | [2020/18] |
Former [2017/45] | For all designated states HiDeep Inc. 3F Dasan Tower 49 Daewangpangyo-ro 644 beon-gil, (676 Sampyeong-dong) Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-400 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Young Min 3 F Dasan Tower, 49 Daewangpangyo-ro 644 beon-gil (676 Sampyeong-dong) Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si 463-400 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Europe LLP Neumarkter Straße 18 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/18] | HGF Europe LLP Neumarkter Str. 18 81673 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/45] | Patronus IP Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neumarkter Strasse 18 81673 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 17157014.6 | 20.02.2017 | [2017/45] | Priority number, date | KR20160054375 | 03.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160054375 | [2017/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3242194 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3242194 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F1/3218, G06F3/041, G06F3/048 | [2019/50] | CPC: |
G06F3/0416 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (CN,KR);
G06F1/3218 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0414 (CN,KR);
G06F3/04166 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2017/45] | G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2017/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVERFAHREN FÜR BERÜHRUNGSEINGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/45] | English: | DISPLAYING METHOD OF TOUCH INPUT DEVICE | [2017/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE DE DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE TACTILE | [2017/45] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 20.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2017 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | IT | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 20.02.2017 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
IT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009046110 (SADLER DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] *; | [A]US2013141342 (BOKMA LOUIS W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0056] *; | [I]US2013181931 (KINOSHITA KENTA [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0070] *; | [A]US2014344608 (WANG WENLONG [CN]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]US2015268802 (KIM SEYEOB [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0068] - paragraph [0084] *; | [A]US2015331508 (NHO HYUNWOO HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] ** paragraph [0053] * |