Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3363564

EP3363564 - ELECTRICALLY DISCHARGING PARTICLES BY INCREASING INTER-PARTICLE CONDUCTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.01.2020
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.03.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  20.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2020New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Technische Universität München
Arcisstrasse 21
80333 München / DE
[2018/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Janson, Stephan
Jakobsplatz 5
86152 Augsburg / DE
 [2018/34]
Representative(s)Lucke, Andreas
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2018/34]
Application number, filing date17157176.321.02.2017
[2018/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3363564
Date:22.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:B22F3/105, H01J37/30, H01J37/317, B33Y30/00
[2018/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/14]
Former [2018/34]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES ENTLADEN VON PARTIKELN AUFGRUND DER STEIGERUNG DER INTERPARTIKELLEIFHÄFIGKEIT[2020/04]
English:ELECTRICALLY DISCHARGING PARTICLES BY INCREASING INTER-PARTICLE CONDUCTIVITY[2018/34]
French:DÉCHARGE ELECTRIQUE DANS DES GRANULES DUE À L'AUGMENTATION DE LA CONDUCTIVITÉ INTERGRANULAIRE[2018/34]
Former [2018/34]ELEKTRISCHE ENTLADUNG DER PARTIKELN AUFGRUND DER STEIGERUNG DER INTERPARTIKELNSLEIFHÄFIGKEIT
Examination procedure22.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/14]
22.02.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.01.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2016279873  (FETTE MARC [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0016] - [0019] - [0022] , [0028]; claims 1-2,3,7,10-12,13 * [Y] 4,8 [I] 4,8;
 [Y]EP2937163  (JEOL LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0019] - [0020] - [0028]; figures 1,3-4,; claims 1-5 *;
 [Y]US6136257  (GRAF BERNHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 2, lines 39-47; figures 1,2; claims 1-6,12-14 * * column 4, lines 24-65 *;
 [YA]US2016368056  (SWAMINATHAN BHARATH [US], et al) [Y] 4,8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] - [0021] - [0052] , [0055] , [0061]; figure 1; claims 1-20 * [A] 2,5,10;
 [A]WO2016044561  (MOOG INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,2; claims 1-18 *