Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3214377

EP3214377 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEATING SYSTEM WITH A CONDENSING BOILER AND HEATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Jaske, Wolfgang
Laxtenerstrasse 14
49811 Lingen / DE
For all designated states
Wolf, Peter
Bümmersteder Strasse 145
26209 Hatten / DE
[2017/36]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2017/36]
Representative(s)Jabbusch, Matthias
Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 85
26131 Oldenburg / DE
[2017/36]
Application number, filing date17157295.122.02.2017
[2017/36]
Priority number, dateDE2016100240727.02.2016         Original published format: DE102016002407
[2017/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3214377
Date:06.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3214377
Date:05.12.2018
Language:DE
[2018/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:F24D3/08, F24D3/18, F24D19/10, F24D17/00
[2017/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/12]
Former [2017/36]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER HEIZUNGSANLAGE MIT EINEM BRENNWERTKESSEL UND HEIZUNGSANLAGE[2017/36]
English:METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEATING SYSTEM WITH A CONDENSING BOILER AND HEATING SYSTEM[2017/36]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE COMPRENANT UNE CHAUDIÈRE À CONDENSATION ET INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFAGE[2017/36]
Examination procedure22.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/12]
08.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.10.2018Fee for grant paid
17.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.09.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/46]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
DK05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
MC05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SI05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/48]AL05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
DK05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
MC05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/45]AL05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
MC05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/39]AL05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SK05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
IS05.04.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/37]AL05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
EE05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RO05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
SM05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL05.12.2018
CZ05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
IT05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
PT05.04.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.12.2018
ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/25]ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
RS05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/24]ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
SE05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
GR06.03.2019
Former [2019/23]ES05.12.2018
FI05.12.2018
HR05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
LV05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
BG05.03.2019
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI05.12.2018
LT05.12.2018
NO05.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT05.12.2018
NO05.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE202007011120U  (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [AD] 1-12 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *;
 [A]EP2273203  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0044]; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2822808  (ERIKSSON LEIF) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [AD]DE202013010117U  (LANG ANDREAS DE) [AD] 1-12 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0030]; figure 1 *
by applicantDE202007011120U
 DE202013010117U
 DE10115090
 EP2199692