Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3213704

EP3213704 - SYSTEM OF SPINAL ARTHODESIS IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.03.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LDR Medical
Parc d'entreprises du Grand Troyes
Quartier Europe de l'Ouest
5, rue de Berlin
10300 Sainte-Savine / FR
[2017/36]
Inventor(s)01 / MERCIER, Alexis
8 rue Saint-Martin
10390 VERRIERES / FR
02 / LEQUETTE, Samuel
11 rue de la Fraternité
33600 PESSAC / FR
 [2017/36]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/36]Debay, Yves
Cabinet Debay
126, Elysee 2
78170 La Celle Saint Cloud / FR
Application number, filing date17158258.827.02.2017
[2017/36]
Priority number, dateFR2016005163726.02.2016         Original published format: FR 1651637
[2017/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3213704
Date:06.09.2017
Language:FR
[2017/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70, A61F2/44, A61F2/30
[2017/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/15]
Former [2017/36]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:IMPLANTATSYSTEM FÜR SPINALE ARTHRODESE[2017/36]
English:SYSTEM OF SPINAL ARTHODESIS IMPLANTS[2017/36]
French:SYSTÈME D`IMPLANTS D`ARTHRODÈSE RACHIDIENNE[2017/36]
Examination procedure27.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
06.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005055096  (SERHAN HASSAN A [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0039] , [0177]; figure 9 *;
 [X]US2008183209  (ROBINSON JANINE C [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * paragraphs [0090] - [0100]; figures 6A,17,18 *;
 [X]US2006079896  (KWAK SEUNGKYU DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-33 * paragraphs [0055] , [0062]; figures 3A,4A,4B *;
 [XD]US2003004572  (GOBLE E MARLOWE [US], et al) [XD] 1-33 * paragraphs [0023] , [0113] , [0114]; figures 30-32 *;
 [YD]US2004127989  (DOORIS ANDREW [US], et al) [YD] 1-33 * paragraphs [0135] - [0141]; figure 11; claims 51-69 *;
 [YD]WO2010121028  (SYNTHES USA LLC [US], et al) [YD] 1-33 * paragraph [0129]; figure 10J *;
 [YD]WO2013001097  (LDR MEDICAL [FR], et al) [YD] 1-33 * page 62, line 6 - line 13; figures 17A-17C *
by applicantUS5876404
 US2005203512
 EP2688521
 WO2010121028
 WO0213732
 WO2013141990
 WO2012094647
 WO2013072582
 WO2011153536
 WO2010090801
 FR2795627
 US2014052260
 WO2013062716
 WO2011019411
 US2009265007
 CN102525624
 US2015127107
 KR20140018668
 WO2015164707
 US5571109
 US2005096745
 US2011282459
 US2012271422
 US2012215313
 US2007282449
 US2002128712
 FR3016793
 FR2954692
 US2013245767
 US2011040382
 FR2866229
 US6045579
 US2013018470
 US2009292316
 US2010106191
 US2008114456
 WO2007109402
 WO2007070819
 US2006271194
 US2011313458
 US2009234389
 WO2012030141
 KR20130112407
 US2012010662
 EP2589351
 EP1718228
 US7291149
 US2012010659
 US2011004247
 US2013116732
 US2008255622
 US2012232599
 US2014025113
 CA2868610
 US2005234459
 WO2012154653
 WO2008149223
 WO2011080535
 WO2013124453
 FR2726171
 WO2016016474
 WO2013001097
    - F. DENIS, "The Three Column Spine and Its Significance in the Classification of Acute Thoracolumbar Spinal Injuries", JOURNAL SPINE, (1983), vol. 8, pages 817 - 831
    - R. LOUIS, "Spinal stability as defined by the three-column spine concept", LE JOURNAL ANATOMIA CLINICA, (1985), vol. 7, pages 33 - 42
    - R. ROY-CAMILLE, "L'instabilité Rachidienne / Spinal Instability", JOURNAL RACHIS, (1994), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 107 - 112