blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3229010 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3229010



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 159
11.12.2018 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
05.12.2018 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
21.08.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
07.02.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
15.01.2018 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.12.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.12.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 3
13.12.2017 European search report Search / examination 4
13.12.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
13.09.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.09.2017 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
23.08.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 2
23.08.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
23.08.2017 Partial European search report Search / examination 3
23.08.2017 Provisional opinion accompanying the partial search results Search / examination 3
21.07.2017 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
14.07.2017 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
17.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.05.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
09.05.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
03.03.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.03.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
03.03.2017 Description Search / examination 36
03.03.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.03.2017 Drawings Search / examination 16
03.03.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
15.04.2011 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 58