blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3229010


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
07.12.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  09.01.2019  [2019/02]
06.12.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
20.08.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.12.2017 Publication of search report published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
08.12.2017 Change - classification published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
08.12.2017 Change - classification published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
28.10.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2017 Change - inventor published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
07.03.2017 Change - representative
07.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid