Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP3229010

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure21.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201811   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:11.10.2017 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:11.10.2017 
Event description:DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION
Ref Document Number:2203733
Country of Ref Document:EP
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:18.10.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:WANG, LIHONG
 
Event date:18.10.2017 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR NAME:MASLOV, KONSTANTIN
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 8/08 20060101ALI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/1455 20060101ALI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 29/24 20060101ALI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 29/06 20060101ALI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 90/30 20160101ALN20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/02 20060101ALI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/00 20060101ALI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G01N 21/17 20060101AFI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/08 20060101ALI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/145 20060101ALI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:10.01.2018 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:G02B 21/00 20060101ALI20171207BHEP
 
Event date:09.01.2019 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20180711