Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3229010

EP3229010 - CONFOCAL PHOTOACOUSTIC MICROSCOPY WITH OPTICAL LATERAL RESOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.2019  [2019/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Washington University in St. Louis
660 South Euclid
St. Louis, MO 63110 / US
[2017/41]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Lihong
Washington University in St. Louis
660 South Euclid
St. Louis, MO 63110 / US
02 / MASLOV, Konstantin
6005 Terri Lynn Drive
St. Louis, MO 63123 / US
 [2017/42]
Former [2017/41]01 / WANG, Lihong
Washington University in St. Louis
660 South Euclid
St. Louis, MO 63110 / US
02 / MASLOV, Konstantin
Washington University in St. Louis
660 South Euclid
St. Louis, MO 63110 / US
Representative(s)Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen
WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[2017/41]
Application number, filing date17159220.724.10.2008
[2017/41]
Priority number, dateUS20070982624P25.10.2007         Original published format: US 982624 P
[2017/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3229010
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3229010
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/17, G01N29/06, A61B8/08, A61B5/1455, G01N29/24, G02B21/00, A61B5/00, A61B5/08, A61B5/02, A61B5/145, // A61B90/30
[2017/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/41]
TitleGerman:KONFOKALE FOTOAKUSTISCHE MIKROSKOPIE MIT OPTISCHER LATERALER AUFLÖSUNG[2017/41]
English:CONFOCAL PHOTOACOUSTIC MICROSCOPY WITH OPTICAL LATERAL RESOLUTION[2017/41]
French:MICROSCOPIE PHOTO-ACOUSTIQUE CONFOCALE PRÉSENTANT UNE RÉSOLUTION LATÉRALE OPTIQUE[2017/41]
Examination procedure11.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/02]
21.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/02]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP08842292.8  / EP2203733
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
25.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201811   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0012262  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 4 - line 26 * * page 7, line 20 - line 33 * * page 11, line 6 - line 31 * * page 19, line 3 - page 20, line 9 * * figure - *;
 [A]US2006184042  (WANG LIHONG [US] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [A]EP1493380  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0024] *