blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3219465 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3219465



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 145
20.03.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.03.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
20.03.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
20.03.2018 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 18
20.03.2018 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 18
20.03.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
20.03.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
06.10.2017 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
06.10.2017 Priority search results Search / examination 6
25.09.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
23.08.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
26.07.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.07.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 5
26.07.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
26.07.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
17.07.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
16.03.2017 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
16.03.2017 Priority document Search / examination 31
06.03.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 4
06.03.2017 Description Search / examination 16
06.03.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.03.2017 Drawings Search / examination 7
06.03.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5