Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3219465

EP3219465 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR WELDING MITRE CUT PLASTIC FRAME PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/38]
Inventor(s)01 / VALENTIN, Manfred
Fritz-Jöde-Weg 7
32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE
 [2017/38]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/38]
Application number, filing date17159452.606.03.2017
[2017/38]
Priority number, dateDE20161010458814.03.2016         Original published format: DE102016104588
[2017/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3219465
Date:20.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29C65/20, // B29C65/78, B29L31/00
[2017/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/17]
Former [2017/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERSCHWEISSEN VON AUF GEHRUNG GESCHNITTENEN RAHMENPROFILEN AUS KUNSTSTOFF[2017/38]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR WELDING MITRE CUT PLASTIC FRAME PROFILES[2017/38]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE SOUDAGE DE PROFILÉS DE CADRE EN PLASTIQUE DÉCOUPÉS EN ONGLET[2017/38]
Examination procedure06.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0947302  (SCHLEGEL BVBA [BE]) [X] 1,7-10,12 * abstract * * figures 4-10, 12c, 13 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0022] * [I] 2-6,11,13-15;
 [X]DE19753846  (DIPRO DICHTUNGSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,10,12 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE19545480  (DEFLEX DICHTSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,10,12 * abstract * * figures 1,2,3,3a,4,5 *
by applicantEP0838324
 EP1072392