Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3225549

EP3225549 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLEANING A LAVATORY FLOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.04.2018Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / CHILDRESS, Jamie
c/o The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/40]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date17160151.109.03.2017
[2017/40]
Priority number, dateUS201662315999P31.03.2016         Original published format: US 201662315999 P
US20161517525407.06.2016         Original published format: US201615175254
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3225549
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.07.2017
ClassificationInternational:B64D11/02, E03D9/00
[2017/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG EINES TOILETTENBODENS[2017/40]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CLEANING A LAVATORY FLOOR[2017/40]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE NETTOYAGE D'UN PLANCHER DE TOILETTES[2017/40]
Examination procedure09.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
09.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US2015322656  (HUANG KEVIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,11 * paragraph [0038]; figure - * [A] 3-6,9,10,12,14-16 [Y] 8,13;
 [XY]US2003211291  (CASTIGLIONE STEPHANIE B [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * paragraphs [0066] , [0067] , [0130]; claim 6 * [Y] 8;
 [XAY]US2006041238  (BOWEN MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9 * paragraphs [0020] , [0025] * [A] 3,8,10,11,14-16 [Y] 13;
 [X]US2014230185  (BUREA MAXIME PIERRICK FRANÇOIS [ES], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0032] - [0040]; figure -; claim 3 *