Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3225866

EP3225866 - MULTI-PLATE CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 01.05.2019  [2019/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi
Aichi 448-8650 / JP
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / SAITO, Shun
c/o Intellectual Property Department
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date17160735.114.03.2017
[2017/40]
Priority number, dateJP2016006361128.03.2016         Original published format: JP 2016063611
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3225866
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3225866
Date:01.05.2019
Language:EN
[2019/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16D13/50, F16D13/69, F16D13/58, F16D13/38, F16D13/70
[2017/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/20]
Former [2017/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:MEHRPLATTEN-KUPPLUNG[2017/40]
English:MULTI-PLATE CLUTCH[2017/40]
French:EMBRAYAGE MULTI-PLAQUE[2017/40]
Examination procedure14.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/20]
14.12.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2019Fee for grant paid
15.03.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.03.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]DE10218365  (ZF SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-5 * figures 4,5 *;
 [A]DE102011018890  (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 5,6 *;
 [A]US4558771  (DESPRES DOMINIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-5 * figure 12 *;
 [A]GB2176548  (AUTOMOTIVE PRODUCTS PLC) [A] 1-5 * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US6035987  (FUKUDA YOSHINOBU [JP]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE102014211884  (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH10103371