Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3231565

EP3231565 - RAZOR CARTRIDGE WITH FLUID MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
[2019/38]
Former [2017/42]For all designated states
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
Boston, MA 02127 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOLLEY, William Owen
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
South Boston, MA02127-1096 / US
02 / PETERSON, Mark
Gillette Management LLC, Reading Innovation Centre
460 Basingstoke Road
Reading, Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB
03 / SPOONER-FLEMING, Joia Kirin
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
South Boston, MA02127-1096 / US
04 / STEPHENS, Alison Fiona
Procter & Gamble Technical Center Ltd
Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
05 / TANDY, James
350 Balestier Road Nr 15-03
329 779 Singapore / SG
06 / WARRICK, Paul Leslie
Gillette Management LLC, Reading Innovation Centre
460 Basingstoke Road
Reading, Berkshire RG2 0QE / GB
07 / WASHINGTON, Jack Anthony
The Gillette Company LLC
One Gillette Park
South Boston, MA02127-1096 / US
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[2019/38]
Former [2017/42]Kohol, Sonia , et al
N.V. Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date17160796.314.03.2017
[2017/42]
Priority number, dateEP2016016319131.03.2016         Original published format: EP 16163191
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3231565
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3231565
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:B26B21/40
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/21]
Former [2017/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:RASIERKLINGENKASSETTE MIT FLUIDVERWALTUNGSSYSTEM[2017/42]
English:RAZOR CARTRIDGE WITH FLUID MANAGEMENT[2017/42]
French:CARTOUCHE DE RASOIR AVEC GESTION DE FLUIDE[2017/42]
Examination procedure14.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/21]
04.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2019Fee for grant paid
12.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[YDA]WO2010039749  (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [YD] 1-5,7-13,15 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 21; figures 4, 5 * [A] 6,14,16,17;
 [YDA]US2012144675  (KEENE ANDREW RUSSELL [US], et al) [YD] 1-5,7-13,15 * paragraph [0021]; figures 3-5 * [A] 6,14,16,17;
 [A]WO2011057170  (GILLETTE CO [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 3, paragraph 2; figures 1, 3, 4 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]US2013097868  (JESSEMEY PAUL MICHAEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0036] , [0 44]; figures 5, 9A *;
 [A]US5953819  (SIMMS GRAHAM JOHN [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 14; figures 4, 6 * * column 3, lines 37-41 *
by applicantWO2010039479
 US2012144675
 US7811553
 US2008060201
 US2009223057
 GB2138438