Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3199538

EP3199538 - PURIFICATION OF TRIPHOSPHORYLATED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES USING CAPTURE TAGS AND MODIFIED TRIPHOSPHORYLATED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AS ACTIVATORS OF RIG-1 HELICASE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.12.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.12.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinische Friedrich-Wilhelms-Universität Bonn
Regina-Pacis-Weg 3
53113 Bonn / DE
[2017/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Ludwig, Janos
Tuckermannweg 6
37085 Göttingen / DE
02 / Goldeck, Marion
Hetzgasse 20/16
1030 Wien / AT
03 / Sproat, Brian
Jaarmarktstraat 48
2221 Booischot / BE
 [2017/31]
Representative(s)Wichmann, Hendrik
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/31]
Application number, filing date17161309.428.03.2012
[2017/31]
Priority number, dateEP2011016003228.03.2011         Original published format: EP 11160032
[2017/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3199538
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
[2017/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.05.2017
ClassificationInternational:C07H21/02, C07H1/04
[2017/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/10]
Former [2017/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:AUFREINIGUNG VON TRIPHOSPHORYLIERTEN OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN MIT EINFANG-TAGS UND MODIFIZIERTEN TRIPHOSPHORYLIERTEN OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN ALS AKTIVATOREN VON RIG-1 HELICASE[2017/31]
English:PURIFICATION OF TRIPHOSPHORYLATED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES USING CAPTURE TAGS AND MODIFIED TRIPHOSPHORYLATED OLIGONUCLEOTIDES AS ACTIVATORS OF RIG-1 HELICASE[2017/31]
French:PURIFICATION D'OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES TRIPHOSPHORYLÉS EN UTILISANT DES MARQUAGES DE CAPTURE ET OLIGONUCLÉOTIDES TRIPHOSPHORYLÉS MODIFIÉS EN TANT QU'ACTIVATEURS DE RGI-1 HELICASE[2017/31]
Examination procedure16.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/10]
17.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
12.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12710950.2  / EP2691410
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
16.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
16.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
20.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
28.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XDAI]WO2009060281  (COLEY PHARM GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 13,14 * pages 1,43 * * claims 1, 8 * * figure 2 * [A] 1-12 [I] 13-15;
 [XA]WO2011028218  (ALNYLAM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * page 31 - page 33 * * pages 37,44 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-12,15;
 [XA]  - LEBEDEV A V ET AL, "PREPARATION OF OLIGODEOXYNUCLEOTIDE 5'-TRIPHOSPHATES USING SOLID SUPPORT APPROACH", NUCLEOSIDES, NUCLEOTIDES AND NUCLEIC ACIDS, TAYLOR & FRANCIS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, (20010101), vol. 20, no. 4-7, doi:10.1081/NCN-100002565, ISSN 1525-7770, pages 1403 - 1409, XP009081703 [X] 13,14 * the whole document * [A] 1-12,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1081/NCN-100002565
 [XA]  - IVAN ZLATEV ET AL, "Efficient Solid-Phase Chemical Synthesis of 5'-Triphosphates of DNA, RNA, and their Analogues", ORGANIC LETTERS, (20100521), vol. 12, no. 10, doi:10.1021/ol1004214, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 2190 - 2193, XP055005331 [X] 13,14 * the whole document * [A] 1-12,15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol1004214
    [XDAY] - MARTIN SCHLEE ET AL, "Recognition of 5' Triphosphate by RIG-I Helicase Requires Short Blunt Double-Stranded RNA as Contained in Panhandle of Negative-Strand Virus", IMMUNITY, (20090701), vol. 31, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.immuni.2009.05.008, ISSN 1074-7613, pages 25 - 34, XP055032801 [XD] 13,14 * the whole document * [A] 1-12 [Y] 13-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.immuni.2009.05.008
 [XY]  - YANLI WANG ET AL, "Structural and functional insights into 5'-ppp RNA pattern recognition by the innate immune receptor RIG-I", NATURE STRUCTURAL & MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (20100701), vol. 17, no. 7, doi:10.1038/nsmb.1863, ISSN 1545-9993, pages 781 - 787, XP055052657 [X] 13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 13-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nsmb.1863
 [XY]  - HORNUNG VEIT ET AL, "5'-Triphosphate RNA is the ligand for RIG-I", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, (20061110), vol. 314, no. 5801, doi:10.1126/SCIENCE.1132505, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 994 - 997, XP002428032 [X] 13,14 * the whole document * [Y] 13-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1132505
by applicantUS6900308
 US7285658
 US7598230
 US7807653
 WO9640159
 WO2009060281
    - SCHLEE ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2009), vol. 31, pages 25 - 34
    - LUDWIG J. ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1989), vol. 54, pages 631 - 635
    - GAUR R.K. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1992), vol. 33, pages 3301 - 3304