Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3219895

EP3219895 - SLIDING DOOR ASSEMBLY AND SLIDING LEAF OF A SLIDING DOOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SCHÜCO International KG
Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15
33609 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/38]
Inventor(s)01 / EL FARTOUKH, Abdelaziz
Am Lehmstich 30
33609 Bielefeld / DE
02 / WIEBE, Anna
Mecklenburger Str. 12
32832 Augustdorf / DE
03 / GOTTSCHALK, Christoph
Bruchteichsweg 18
49324 Melle / DE
04 / NIENHÜSER-SONNENSCHEIN, Rolf
Heidestr. 57
49324 Melle / DE
 [2017/38]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/38]
Application number, filing date17161656.817.03.2017
[2017/38]
Priority number, dateDE20161010512418.03.2016         Original published format: DE102016105124
[2017/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3219895
Date:20.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:E06B3/263, E06B3/54, // E06B3/46
[2017/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/17]
Former [2017/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHIEBETÜRANORDNUNG UND SCHIEBEFLÜGEL EINER SCHIEBETÜRANORDNUNG[2017/38]
English:SLIDING DOOR ASSEMBLY AND SLIDING LEAF OF A SLIDING DOOR ASSEMBLY[2017/38]
French:SYSTÈME DE PORTE COULISSANTE ET VANTAIL COULISSANT D'UN SYSTÈME DE PORTE COULISSANT[2017/38]
Examination procedure17.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2018Examination requested  [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]CN103850588  (BEIJING NEW BUILDING MATERIALS PUBLIC LTD) [X] 1-3,15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0032]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6-9 [I] 4,5,10-14;
 [I]EP2463470  (ORCHIDEES CONST SA [CH]) [I] 1-5,10-15 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010]; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE19939868  (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [Y] 6-9 * figures 1,6; claim 1 *;
 [Y]WO9841724  (ERIKSSON LARS [SE]) [Y] 6-8 * page 4, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1,2,3 *;
 [Y]DE9217883U  (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [Y] 6-9 * page 2, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]EP1318264  (NIEMANN HANS DIETER [DE]) [A] 10,11 * paragraphs [0033] - [0036]; figures 2a, 2b *;
 [A]EP2251519  (HAWA AG [CH]) [A] 3-7,9,14 * figures 1-3; claims 1, 4, 8, 11, 14 *
by applicantWO2010024703