Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3222532 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3222532



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1643
20.07.2023 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.07.2023 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
14.07.2023 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
11.07.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
11.07.2023 French translation of claims Opposition 4
11.07.2023 German translation of the claims Opposition 3
11.07.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
11.04.2023 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 41
11.04.2023 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 41
11.04.2023 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 37
04.04.2023 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
03.04.2023 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 16
03.04.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
03.04.2023 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 2
27.03.2023 Description submitted during oral proceedings Appeal 1
27.03.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.03.2023 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
27.03.2023 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 6
27.01.2023 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
27.01.2023 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
25.01.2023 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 4
25.01.2023 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 4
11.10.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
06.10.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
06.10.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.10.2022 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
31.08.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
26.08.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
26.08.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
26.08.2022 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
26.08.2022 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
28.06.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
28.06.2022 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
28.06.2022 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 11
23.06.2022 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
30.05.2022 F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member Appeal 1
22.04.2022 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
19.04.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
19.04.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 2
19.04.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 2
19.04.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 Appeal 2
19.04.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 Appeal 2
19.04.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 Appeal 2
19.04.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 Appeal 1
19.04.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 07 Appeal 2
19.04.2022 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 08 Appeal 2
19.04.2022 Claims Appeal 2
19.04.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
19.04.2022 Reply to appeal Appeal 49
14.12.2021 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.12.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
09.12.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
09.12.2021 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
12.10.2021 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
12.10.2021 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
07.10.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
07.10.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
07.10.2021 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
16.08.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
02.08.2021 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2021 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
30.07.2021 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
30.07.2021 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 38
30.07.2021 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 13
30.07.2021 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.07.2021 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
30.07.2021 Means of redress Opposition 2
30.07.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
30.07.2021 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
30.07.2021 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.07.2021 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
30.07.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 70
30.07.2021 Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition Opposition 70
18.05.2021 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 8
25.02.2021 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
22.02.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
22.02.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
22.02.2021 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.02.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
09.02.2021 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.08.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.07.2020 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.06.2020 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
12.06.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 13
12.06.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 13
12.06.2020 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
12.06.2020 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.06.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.06.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
08.06.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 13
02.06.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
02.06.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
02.06.2020 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 12
21.02.2020 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 72
14.02.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.02.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.02.2020 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 71
04.10.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.10.2019 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 2
16.09.2019 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 29
12.09.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 001 Opposition 20
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 002 Opposition 18
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 003 Opposition 14
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 004 Opposition 8
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 005 Opposition 8
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 006 Opposition 42
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 007 Opposition 18
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 008 Opposition 10
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 009 Opposition 12
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 010 Opposition 10
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 011 Opposition 10
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 012 Opposition 28
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 013 Opposition 28
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 014 Opposition 20
12.09.2019 Citation in opposition procedure - 015 Opposition 12
12.09.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
12.09.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 45
12.09.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
10.09.2019 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.09.2019 Consolidated list of cited opposition documents Opposition 1
10.09.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
10.09.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
10.09.2019 Notice of opposition Opposition 23
10.09.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 42
10.09.2019 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
10.09.2019 Published international application - A1 Opposition 41
03.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
22.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
12.11.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.11.2018 Information about intention to grant a patent Search / examination 3
12.11.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.11.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 53
12.11.2018 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 53
24.09.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.09.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 1
24.09.2018 Claims Search / examination 1
24.09.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
24.09.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
24.09.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.09.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
28.05.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.05.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.05.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.05.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 53
28.05.2018 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 53
24.04.2018 Examination started Search / examination 1
02.10.2017 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
30.08.2017 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 European search report Search / examination 2
23.06.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
20.06.2017 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
20.06.2017 Priority document Search / examination 62
20.06.2017 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 6
06.06.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 Claims Search / examination 5
22.05.2017 Description Search / examination 20
22.05.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.05.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.03.2017 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
21.03.2017 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
21.03.2017 Drawings Search / examination 28
21.03.2017 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
21.03.2017 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 29