Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3379645

EP3379645 - SOLAR ANTENNA COMPRISING GRAPHENE, SOLAR UNIT COMPRISING MULTIPLE SOLAR ANTENNAS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SOLAR UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.06.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/39]
Inventor(s)01 / ABBAK, Mehmet
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / ÖCAL, Ömür
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
03 / MEMISOGLU, Görkem
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/39]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/39]
Application number, filing date17162302.822.03.2017
[2018/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3379645
Date:26.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/24
[2018/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/39]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SOLARANTENNE MIT GRAPHEN, SOLAREINHEIT MIT MEHREREN SOLARANTENNEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER SOLAREINHEIT[2018/39]
English:SOLAR ANTENNA COMPRISING GRAPHENE, SOLAR UNIT COMPRISING MULTIPLE SOLAR ANTENNAS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A SOLAR UNIT[2018/39]
French:ANTENNE SOLAIRE COMPRENANT DU GRAPHÈNE, UNITÉ SOLAIRE COMPORTANT PLUSIEURS ANTENNES SOLAIRES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE UNITÉ SOLAIRE[2018/39]
Examination procedure22.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.11.2017Examination requested  [2018/39]
17.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]CN106450735  (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM) [X] 1 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0071]; figure 3 * [A] 5-13 [I] 2-4;
 [XAI]GB2516443  (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1 * page 6, line 4 - page 9, line 18; figures 1,2 * [A] 5-13 [I] 2-4;
 [XAI]CN106373968  (GUO WEI) [X] 1 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,2 * [A] 5-13 [I] 2-4;
 [A]EP2053691  (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US2007240757  (REN ZHIFENG [US], et al) [A] 5 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043]; figure 1 *
by applicantUS2012032847
 US2015243817
 US2009026579