Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3226606

EP3226606 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RAN-WLAN AGGREGATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.02.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TCL Communication Limited
1910-12A, Tower 3
33 Canton Road
Tsim Sha Tsui
Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / JACTAT, Caroline
1910-12A, Tower 3
33 Canton Road
Tsim Sha Tsui
Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
02 / BONNARD, Pierre
1910-12A, Tower 3
33 Canton Road
Tsim Sha Tsui
Kowloon, Hong Kong / CN
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/40]Cordina, Kevin John
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Application number, filing date17163366.228.03.2017
[2017/40]
Priority number, dateGB2016000554801.04.2016         Original published format: GB 201605548
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3226606
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/08, // H04W88/06
[2017/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/09]
Former [2017/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR RAN-WLAN-AGGREGATION[2017/40]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR RAN-WLAN AGGREGATION[2017/40]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'AGRÉGATION RAN-WLAN[2017/40]
Examination procedure28.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2018Examination requested  [2018/09]
27.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]WO2015059055  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [X] 1,2,12 * page 4, line 29 - line 30; figure 1 * * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 13 * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 30 * [A] 8,13,14 [Y] 9-11,15 [I] 3-7;
 [XAY]WO2016025475  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1,8,13,14 * figure 9 * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0111] * [A] 2-7,9-12 [Y] 15;
 [YA]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 13)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20160111), vol. RAN WG2, no. V13.2.0, pages 1 - 290, XP051047745 [Y] 9-11 * page 231, line 1 - line 2 * [A] 1-8,12-15