Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3232223

EP3232223 - REFLECTIVE DEVICE FOR USE IN AN OPTICAL MEASURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.11.2017
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH
Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
[2018/07]
Former [2017/42]For all designated states
Airbus DS GmbH
Robert-Koch-Str. 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / MANDEL, Oliver
Panoramastr. 7
88255 Baienfurt / DE
02 / WEISE, Dennis
Am Rheinufer 4
78467 Konstanz / DE
03 / CHWALLA, Michael
Frühlingsstr. 14
6850 Dornbirn / AT
 [2017/42]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/42]
Application number, filing date17163598.029.03.2017
[2017/42]
Priority number, dateDE20161020637315.04.2016         Original published format: DE102016206373
[2017/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3232223
Date:18.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:G01S17/08, G01S17/74, G01S7/481
[2017/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/52]
Former [2017/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REFLEKTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWENDUNG IN EINEM OPTISCHEN MESSSYSTEM[2017/42]
English:REFLECTIVE DEVICE FOR USE IN AN OPTICAL MEASURING SYSTEM[2017/42]
French:DISPOSITIF RÉFLÉCHISSANT DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ DANS UN SYSTÈME DE MESURE OPTIQUE[2017/42]
Examination procedure29.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.11.2017Examination requested  [2017/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2005157410  (PARKER DAVID H [US]) [X] 1,3,8-10,13 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * figures 1, 2, 4, 5, 6 * [A] 4-7,11,12 [I] 2,14,15;
 [XAI]US5530549  (BROWN LAWRENCE B [US]) [X] 1-3,8-10,13 * column 1, line 7 - line 17 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 49 * * column 6, line 5 - line 22 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 4-7,11,12 [I] 14,15;
 [XAI]DE3150642  (PRECITRONIC [DE]) [X] 1,3,7,11-13 * page 1, line 1 - line 9 * * page 9, line 1 - line 22 * * page 11, line 1 - line 12 * * page 14, line 10 - line 15 * * page 16, line 12 - line 14 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 4-6,8-10 [I] 2,14,15;
 [XAI]EP0236137  (CHELSEA INSTR LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8 * column 1, line 3 - line 11 * * column 3, line 36 - line 53 * * figure 1 * [A] 9-13 [I] 2,6,14,15