Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3382448

EP3382448 - DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.09.2019  [2019/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/40]
Inventor(s)01 / ERDÍNÇ, Cihan
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / USLU, Mutlu
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/40]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2018/40]
Application number, filing date17163653.329.03.2017
[2018/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3382448
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/13357
[2018/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2018/40]
English:DISPLAY APPARATUS[2018/40]
French:AFFICHEUR[2018/40]
Examination procedure04.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/36]
17.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]JP2003084281  (SHARP KK) [X] 1-3,8-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1-3 * [I] 5-7,12-14;
 [XI]JP2011014513  (TTT:KK) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0019]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0021]; figure 6 * [I] 4,6,7,11,13,14
by applicantUS2011069238