Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3382288

EP3382288 - HEATING AND/OR COOLING SYSTEM HAVING REGULATED FLUID FLOW TO A ZONE, AND AN ARRANGEMENT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/40]
Inventor(s)01 / OZVURAL, Gorkem
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/40]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2018/40]
Application number, filing date17163715.030.03.2017
[2018/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3382288
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:F24D19/10
[2018/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HEIZ- UND/ODER KÜHLSYSTEM MIT GEREGELTEM FLUIDSTROM ZU EINER ZONE UND ANORDNUNG DAVON[2018/40]
English:HEATING AND/OR COOLING SYSTEM HAVING REGULATED FLUID FLOW TO A ZONE, AND AN ARRANGEMENT THEREOF[2018/40]
French:SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE ET/OU REFROIDISSEMENT AYANT UN DÉBIT RÉGULÉ DE FLUIDE VERS UNE ZONE ET SON AGENCEMENT[2018/40]
Examination procedure04.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/37]
17.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0189614  (TNO [NL]) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-13 * page 4, line 16 - page 13, line 36; figures 1,3-5 * [I] 5,6,10;
 [XI]DE202010017775U  (UPONOR INNOVATION AB [SE]) [X] 1-3,7-9,11-13 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * [I] 4-6,10;
 [XI]US6062485  (STEGE DANIEL K [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-13 * column 4, line 42 - column 8, line 50; figure 1 * [I] 5,6,10;
 [XI]WO2004083733  (DANFOSS AS [DK]; SEERUP JOERGEN [DK]; GREGERSEN NIELS [DK]) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-13 * page 7, line 20 - page 10, line 12; figure 1 * [I] 5,6,10