Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3226126

EP3226126 - IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.01.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-Gu
Seoul
07336 / KR
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / PATIL, Kiran M
LG soft india, Embassy Tech Square, Cessna
Business Park Internal Road, Kadubeesanahalli
560103 Bengaluru, Karnataka / IN
02 / MUNIYASAMY, Vijayasarathy
LG soft india, Embassy Tech Square, Cessna
Business Park Internal Road, Kadubeesanahalli
560103 Bengaluru, Karnataka / IN
03 / REDDY, Jayanth
LG soft india, Embassy Tech Square, Cessna
Business Park Internal Road, Kadubeesanahalli
560103 Bengaluru, Karnataka / IN
04 / CHOUDHURY, Chamok Nath
LG soft india, Embassy Tech Square, Cessna
Business Park Internal Road, Kadubeesanahalli
560103 Bengaluru, Karnataka / IN
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date17163777.030.03.2017
[2017/40]
Priority number, dateKR2016004028901.04.2016         Original published format: KR 20160040289
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3226126
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/436, H04N21/41, H04N21/422, H04N21/45, G06F3/14, G06F9/44
[2018/03]
Former International [2017/40]G06F9/44, H04N21/41, H04N21/422, H04N21/45, G06F3/0488, G06F3/14
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/49]
Former [2017/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BILDANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2017/40]
English:IMAGE DISPLAY APPARATUS[2017/40]
French:AFFICHEUR D'IMAGES[2017/40]
Examination procedure30.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/40]
30.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[X]US2014032635  (PIMMEL KIM P [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 16] , [0 22] - [0023] - [0 29] - [0033] - [0 42]; figures 4-7, 14; claims 1, 2, 8, 15 *;
 [X]US2014009394  (LEE KWONTAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 1-7, 16; claims 1-3, 10-13, 19 *;
 [Y]US2013210488  (LEE DONGHEE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * figures 1-3, 6, 8, 10, 19; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2012088548  (YUN CHANPHILL [KR], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraphs [0075] - [0099] - [ 101] - [0103]; figures 1-4, 7-12 *;
 [A]US2013326397  (KIM MIYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0027] - [0031] - [ 103] , [ 116] - [0125]; figures 5-8; claims 1, 2 *