Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3382085

EP3382085 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A WASHING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2019New entry: Decision on request for further processing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2018/40]
Inventor(s)01 / ÖZEN, Erol
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
02 / DALKILIÇ, Sercan
C/O Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2018/40]
Representative(s)Flint, Adam
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2018/40]
Application number, filing date17163990.930.03.2017
[2018/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3382085
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2017
ClassificationInternational:D06F33/02, // D06F93/00
[2018/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/24]
Former [2018/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE WASCHMASCHINE[2018/40]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A WASHING MACHINE[2018/40]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE MACHINE À LAVER[2018/40]
Examination procedure29.03.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
29.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/24]
29.04.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
29.04.2019Request for further processing filed
29.04.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.05.2019Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
29.04.2019Request for further processing filed
29.04.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.05.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAY]WO2006028326  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,5-8,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0007] - [0027] - [0035] - [0042] - [0061]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3 [Y] 2,4,9-14;
 [XAI]WO2006009375  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0024] - [0033] - [0077] - [0083] - [0094] - [0107] - [0134] - [0136] - [0150] - [0156]; figure -; claim - * [A] 2,4,8-15 [I] 3;
 [YA]WO2011066358  (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US], et al) [Y] 2,11-14 * paragraphs [0002] , [0023] - [0027]; figure -; claim - * [A] 1,3-10,15;
 [YA]US9280148  (COLETT HANNAH R [US], et al) [Y] 4,9,10 * column 2, line 26 - column 11, line 46; figure - * [A] 1-3,5-8,11-15