Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3225180

EP3225180 - SURGICAL STAPLING SYSTEM COMPRISING A CONTOURABLE SHAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.12.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.04.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ethicon LLC
475 Street C, Suite 401
Los Frailes Industrial Park
00969 Guaynabo / PR
[2017/40]
Inventor(s)01 / SHELTON, IV, Frederick E.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
02 / HARRIS, Jason L.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
 [2017/40]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2017/40]
Application number, filing date17164120.231.03.2017
[2017/40]
Priority number, dateUS20161508928401.04.2016         Original published format: US201615089284
[2017/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3225180
Date:04.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/072, A61B17/115
[2017/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/20]
Former [2017/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHES KLAMMERSYSTEM MIT EINER KONTURIERBAREN WELLE[2017/40]
English:SURGICAL STAPLING SYSTEM COMPRISING A CONTOURABLE SHAFT[2017/40]
French:SYSTÈME D'AGRAFAGE CHIRURGICAL COMPRENANT UNE TIGE CONFIGURABLE[2017/40]
Examination procedure31.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
04.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2018Examination requested  [2018/20]
05.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5271543  (GRANT RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-13,15 * column 4, line 13 - line 64 * * column 9, line 51 - column 11, line 17 * * column 20, line 64 - column 22, line 58; figure - * [I] 2,8,14;
 [XI]EP0095970  (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9-11,13,15 * page 3, line 1 - line 30 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 6 * * page 14, line 37 - page 20, line 37; figure - * [I] 2,6,8,12,14;
 [XI]EP0634144  (ETHICON INC [US]) [X] 1,3-5,7,9-11,13,15 * column 8, line 31 - column 11, line 31; figures 13-16 * [I] 2,6,8,12,14;
 [A]US2012080332  (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0377] - paragraph [0390]; figures 61-68 *;
 [A]WO02081013  (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,6-8,12-14 * page 4, line 15 - line l *;
 [A]US2014330074  (MORRISS JOHN H [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6-8,12-14 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0015] *
by applicantUS2014246471
 US2014246472
 US2014249557
 US2014246474
 US2014246478
 US2014246477
 US2014246479
 US2014246475
 US2014246473
 US2014246476
 US2014263542
 US2014263537
 US2014263564
 US2014263541
 US2014263538
 US2014263554
 US2014263565
 US2014263553
 US2014263543
 US2014277017
 US2014263539
 US2015272582
 US2015272581
 US2015272580
 US2015272574
 US2015272579
 US2015272569
 US2015272571
 US2015272578
 US2015272570
 US2015272572
 US2015272557
 US2015277471
 US2015280424
 US2015272583
 US2015280384
 US2016066912
 US2016066914
 US2016066910
 US2016066909
 US2016066915
 US2016066911
 US2016066916
 US2016066913
 US2014305987
 US2014305989
 US2014305988
 US2014309666
 US2014305991
 US2014305994
 US2014309665
 US2014305990
 US2014305992
 US2012298719
 US2015272575
 US2015297232
 US2015238187
 EP0795298
 US5605272
 US5697543
 US2005246881
 US2007208359
 US4527724
 US5137198
 US5405073
 US8360297
 US5403312
 US7000818
 US7422139
 US7464849
 US7670334
 US7753245
 US8393514
 US7845537
 US7980443
 US8210411
 US8608045
 US8220688
 US8733613
 US8561870
 US9072535
 US9101358
 US2014263551
 US2014263552
 US2007175955
 US8308040
 US20080031573