Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3243846

EP3243846 - MULTI-HEADED CHAIN SHUTTLING AGENTS AND THEIR USE FOR THE PREPARATION OF BLOCK COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies Llc
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2017/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Arriola, Daniel
4608 Arbor Drive
Midland, MI Michigan 48642 / US
02 / Clark, Thomas
906 Holyrood Street
Midland, MI Michigan 48640 / US
03 / Frazier, Kevin
1105 Tanwood Court
Midland, MI Michigan 48642 / US
04 / Klamo, Sara
2428 Morning Dawn Dr.
Midland, MI Michigan 48642 / US
05 / Timmers, Francis
4605 Lund Drive
Midland, MI Michigan 48642 / US
 [2017/46]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
Carnegieplein 5
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[2017/46]
Application number, filing date17164138.420.07.2010
[2017/46]
Priority number, dateUS20090229610P29.07.2009         Original published format: US 229610 P
[2017/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3243846
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3243846
Date:24.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:C08F4/659, C07F3/02, C08F10/00, C07F3/06, C07F5/02, C07F5/06
[2017/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/46]
TitleGerman:MEHRENDIGE KETTENÜBERTRAGUNGSREAGENZIEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BLOCKCOPOLYMEREN[2017/46]
English:MULTI-HEADED CHAIN SHUTTLING AGENTS AND THEIR USE FOR THE PREPARATION OF BLOCK COPOLYMERS[2017/46]
French:AGENTS DE TRANSFERT RÉVERSIBLE DE CHAÎNES À TÊTES MULTIPLES ET LEUR UTILISATION POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE COPOLYMÈRES SÉQUENCÉS[2017/46]
Examination procedure31.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/46]
31.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.07.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10737196.5  / EP2459598
Divisional application(s)EP18212194.7  / EP3489264
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[ID]WO2007035493  (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [ID] 1-6 * page 79, line 14 - page 80, line 5 *
by applicantWO2007035493
 WO2007035485
 WO9834970
 US6380341
 US6169151
 US5210338
 US5276220
 US6444867
 WO2005090427
 US2006199930
 US2007167578
 US2008311812
 US7355089
 WO2009012215
 EP0277003
 US5153157
 US5064802
 US5321106
 US5721185
 US5350723
 US5425872
 US5625087
 US5883204
 US5919983
 US5783512
 WO9915534
 WO9942467
 US5296433
 US6214760
 US6160146
 US6140521
 US6696379
 US6395671
 WO9807515
 EP0573120
 WO9407928
 WO9514044
 US5453410
 WO9809996
 WO9918135
 WO03010171
 US5849852
 US5859653
 US5869723
 EP0615981
 WO9832775
 US5648310
 US5672669
 US5977251
 US6319989
 US6683149
 US4588790
 US4543399
 US5352749
 US5436304
 US5405922
 US5462999
 US5461123
 US5453471
 US5032562
 US5028670
 US5473028
 US5106804
 US5556238
 US5541270
 US5608019
 US5616661
 US4430563
 US4663220
 US4668566
 US4322027
 US4413110
 US3485706
 WO2004021622
 US6545088
 US6538070
 US6566446
 US5844045
 US5869575
 US6448341
 US6051681
 US3758643
 US3806558
 US5051478
 US4104210
 US4130535
 US4202801
 US4271049
 US4340684
 US4250273
 US4927882
 US4311628
 US5248729
 US4798081
 WO03040195
 US2003204017
 WO2004024740
 US6897276
 US6268444
 US2003004286
    - NEWKOME, G.R.; BAKER, G.R.; YOUNG, J.K.; TRAYNHAM, J.G., "A Systematic Nomenclature for Cascade Polymers", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE: PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 312, pages 641 - 651
    - EICK, H.; KNOCHEL, P., ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1996), vol. 35, pages 218 - 220
    - WEHMEYER, R.M.; RIEKE, R. D., J. ORG. CHEM., (1991), vol. 56, pages 1445 - 1453
    - LONGEAU, A.; DURAND, S.; SPIEGEL, A.; KNOCHEL, P., TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1997), vol. 8, pages 987 - 990
    - LIEBER; BRINTZINGER, MACROMOLECULES, (2000), vol. 33, pages 9192 - 9199
    - LIU; RYTTER, MACROMOLECULAR RAPID COMM., (2001), vol. 22, pages 952 - 956
    - BRUASETH; RYTTER, MACROMOLECULES, (2003), vol. 36, pages 3026 - 3034
    - RYTTER, POLYMER, (2004), vol. 45, pages 7853 - 7861
    - GIBSON ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2004), vol. 126, pages 10701 - 10712
    - EISCH, J. J.; KOTOWICZ, B. W., EUR. J. INORG. CHEM., (1998), pages 761 - 769
    - BHANU PRASAD, A. S.; EICK, H.; KNOCHEL, P., J. ORGANOMET. CHEM., (1998), vol. 562, pages 133 - 139
    - J. CHEM. SOC. CHEM. COMM., (1993), pages 383 - 384
    - LAMBERT, J. B. ET AL., ORGANOMETALLICS, (1994), vol. 13, pages 2430 - 2443
    - NEGISHI, ORGANOMETALLICS IN ORGANIC SYNTHESIS, (1980), vol. 1, 2
    - PEROXIDE VULCANIZATION OF ELASTOMERS, (200107), vol. 74, no. 3
    - RUDIN, A., Modern Methods of Polymer Characterization, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1991), pages 103 - 112
    - WILLIAMS; WARD, J. POLYM. SCI., POLYM. LET., (1968), vol. 6, page 621
    - J. ORGANOMETALLIC CHEM., (1982), vol. 224, page 217
 US20030429024