Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3222144

EP3222144 - PESTICIDAL MIXTURES INCLUDING SPIROHETEROCYCLIC PYRROLIDINE DIONES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.01.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.11.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.09.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Change - applicantpublished on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[2019/46]
Former [2017/39]For all designated states
SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / BUCHHOLZ, Anke
Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schaffhauserstrasse
4332 Stein / CH
02 / HATT, Fabienne
Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215
4002 Basel / CH
03 / RINDLISBACHER, Alfred
Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schaffhauserstrasse
4332 Stein / CH
04 / MUEHLEBACH, Michel
Syngenta Crop Protection AG
Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schaffhauserstrasse
4332 Stein / CH
 [2017/39]
Representative(s)SYNGENTA IP
CHBS-B4.8
Rosentalstrasse 67
4058 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2019/27]Syngenta International AG
CHBS-B4.8
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Former [2017/39]Syngenta International AG
WRO B8-Z1-30
Schwarzwaldallee 215
4058 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date17164405.717.01.2013
[2017/39]
Priority number, dateEP2012015140117.01.2012         Original published format: EP 12151401
[2017/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3222144
Date:27.09.2017
Language:EN
[2017/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3222144
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3222144
Date:03.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2018
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/90, A01N47/40, A01P7/04, A01P7/02
[2017/39]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/42]
Former [2017/39]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PESTIZIDGEMISCHE MIT SPIROHETEROCYCLISCHEN PYRROLIDINDIONEN[2017/39]
English:PESTICIDAL MIXTURES INCLUDING SPIROHETEROCYCLIC PYRROLIDINE DIONES[2017/39]
French:MÉLANGES PESTICIDES COMPRENANT DES PYRROLIDINE DIONES SPIROHÉTÉROCYCLIQUES[2017/39]
Examination procedure31.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.08.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/42]
19.11.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
14.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.05.2019Fee for grant paid
23.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13701938.6  / EP2804482
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[ID]WO2009049851  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [ID] 1-15 * Tables 1-22, Tables A, C, E, F, page 42, l. 18; p. 43, l. 2-3; p. 53, l. 26; p. 55, l. 23-24; p. 56, l. 30; p. 58, l. 19; p. 60, l. 3; p. 62, l. 24; claims 1-8 *;
 [ID]WO2010063670  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [ID] 1-15 * Tables 1-8, 13, 15, 20-23, 25- 36, 39-42, 44-47,65, 75, 77-83, P1, P2;p. 72, l. 1-2, 23-25; p. 83, l. 30-31; p. 85, l. 32; p. 87, l. 5; p. 88, l. 31; p. 90, l. 18; p. 93, l. 10-11; claims 1-13 *;
 [ID]WO2010066780  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [ID] 1-15 * Tables 1-7, 12, 14, 19-23, 25-31, 40-42, 45-48, 50-51, 53-55, 58-61, 63-64, 105, 107, 111-112, P1, P2 ,p. 72, l. 1-2, 24-26; p. 83, l. 30-31; p. 85, l.33; p. 87, l.5; p. 88, l. 31; p. 90, l. 18; p. 93, l. 10-11; claims 1-9 *;
 [I]WO2011151199  (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH], et al) [I] 1-15 * Tables 1-4, 10-13, 19-22, 28-31, 46-49, 73-76, 82-85, 91-94, 100-103, 109-112, 118-121, 127-130, 136-139, 145-148, 190-193, 199-202, 208-211, 217-220, 226-229, 244-247, 253-256, 262-265, P1-P2; p. 102, l. 25-26; p. 103, l. 13-15; p. 114, l.26-27; p. 116, l. 28-29; p. 118, l. 2; p. 119, l. 31; p. 121, l. 18; p. 124, l. 10-11; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]EP2127522  (BAYER CROPSCIENCE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * Claim 1 (II-4A1); Table A (I-7)+Acetamiprid(25) *
by applicantWO2009049851
 WO2010063670
 WO2010066780
 WO2008071405
 WO2009074314
 WO0215701
 WO03018810
 EP0374753
 WO9307278
 WO9534656
 EP0427529
 EP0451878
 WO03052073
 EP0367474
 EP0401979
 WO9013651
 EP0392225
 WO9533818
 EP0353191
 WO03000906
 WO2008037373
 WO9734485
 US4834908
    - CLIVE TOMLIN, The Pesticide Manual, BRITISH CROP PROTECTION COUNCIL. 15TH ED.
    - COLBY, S.R., "Calculating synergistic and antagonistic responses of herbicide combination", WEEDS, (1967), vol. 15, pages 20 - 22