blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3385428

EP3385428 - NONWOVEN CELLULOSE FIBER FABRIC WITH FIBERS HAVING NON-CIRCULAR CROSS SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LENZING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werkstrasse 2
4860 Lenzing / AT
[2018/41]
Inventor(s)01 / Carlyle, Tom
7261 Dellwood Creek Circle
Spanish Fort, AL Alabama 36527 / US
02 / Einzmann, Mirko
Sandlingstraße 9
4600 Wels / AT
03 / Goldhalm, Gisela
Mozartstraße 2
3363 Neufurth / AT
04 / Hayhurst, Malcolm John
251 Nuneation Road
Bulkington, Warwickshire CV12 9RZ / GB
05 / Mayer, Katharina
Feldstrasse 39/12
4813 Altmünster / AT
06 / Sagerer Foric, Ibrahim
Prinz Eugen-Straße 51
4840 Vöcklabruck / AT
 [2018/41]
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/41]Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstrasse 58
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date17164518.703.04.2017
[2018/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3385428
Date:10.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2017
ClassificationIPC:D04H3/013, D04H3/018
[2018/41]
CPC:
D04H3/013 (EP); D04H3/018 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/41]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:CELLULOSEFASERSTOFF MIT FASERN MIT NICHTKREISFÖRMIGEM QUERSCHNITTT[2018/41]
English:NONWOVEN CELLULOSE FIBER FABRIC WITH FIBERS HAVING NON-CIRCULAR CROSS SECTION[2018/41]
French:TISSU DE FIBRES DE CELLULOSE NON TISSÉ AVEC DES FIBRES AYANT UNE SECTION TRANSVERSALE NON CIRCULAIRE[2018/41]
Examination procedure11.04.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/37]
26.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2019/37]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201903   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6221487  (LUO MENGKUI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,12-15 * claims 1-14 * [I] 3-7,11;
 [XI]US2005227563  (BOND ERIC B [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,11-15 * page 2, paragraph 27 * * page 3, paragraphs 32,33 * * page 5, paragraph 56 * * page 6, paragraph 71 * * page 6, paragraph 75 - page 7 * * page 7, paragraph 78 * [I] 3,7,9,10;
 [XI]WO2007143761  (CHEMIEFASER LENZING AG [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,12-15 * claims 1-44 *[I] 3-7,11;
 [XI]WO2015152594  (KOLON INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,8,12,13 * abstract * [I] 3-7,11
by applicantWO9807911
 WO9826122
 WO9947733
 WO9964649
 US6197230
 EP1358369
 WO2005106085
 WO2007124521
 WO2007124522
 EP2013390
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.