EP3229153 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING DATA STRUCTURES TO REPRESENT AND COMPRESSED DATA PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indiggo Associates LLC 4600 East West Highway Suite 875 Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2017/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PERINCHERRY, Vijay 11120 Candlelight Lane Potomac, MD 20854 / US | 02 /
GELBART, Janine 5702 Bradley Blvd. Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 03 /
INZELSTEIN, Marc 10951 Tuckerman Heights Circle Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2017/41] | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 17165375.1 | 06.04.2017 | [2017/41] | Priority number, date | US201615092349 | 06.04.2016 Original published format: US201615092349 | [2017/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3229153 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2017/41] | CPC: |
G06F16/437 (EP,IL,US);
G06T11/206 (IL,US);
G06F16/1744 (EP,IL,US);
G06F16/24578 (EP,IL,US);
G06F16/907 (EP,IL,US);
G06F3/0481 (IL,US);
G06F3/0484 (IL,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/21] |
Former [2017/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON DATENSTRUKTUREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG KOMPRIMIERTER DATENPROFILE | [2017/41] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR GENERATING DATA STRUCTURES TO REPRESENT AND COMPRESSED DATA PROFILES | [2017/41] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE STRUCTURES DE DONNÉES DE REPRÉSENTATION ET DE PROFILS DE DONNÉES COMPRESSÉES | [2017/41] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2018 | Examination requested [2018/21] | 24.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.11.2021 | 04.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/18] | 25.12.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   21.10.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011307328 (CRITES ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0017] - [0021] - [0036] - [0049] - [0055] *[I] 6-9,11-15; | [XI]US2012246302 (LAFLEUR JEAN [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10,15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0032] - [0038] - [0058] - [0072] - [0077] - [0083]; figure 1b * [I] 3,7-9,11-14 |